EP1500501 - Driving apparatus in printing press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Komori Corporation 11-1, Azumabashi 3-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/04] | For all designated states Komori Corporation 11-1, Azumabashi 3-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tobe, Koichi Toride Plant Komori Corp. 5-1, Higashi 4-chome Toride-shi Ibaraki / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Hideaki Toride Plant Komori Corp. 5-1, Higashi 4-chome Toride-shi Ibaraki / JP | [2005/04] | Representative(s) | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/04] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich R., Dipl.-Phys., et al SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04016459.2 | 13.07.2004 | [2005/04] | Priority number, date | JP20030200996 | 24.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003200996 | [2005/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1500501 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1500501 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/008, F16D1/108 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
B41F31/15 (EP,US);
B41F13/008 (EP,US);
F16D11/14 (EP,US);
B41P2213/256 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/04] | Title | German: | Antriebsvorrichtung in Druckmaschinen | [2005/04] | English: | Driving apparatus in printing press | [2005/04] | French: | Dispositif d'entaînement dans machines à impression | [2005/04] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 11.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/52] | 27.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1147889 (KOMORI PRINTING MACH [JP]) [A] 1-8* paragraphs [0012] - [0028] - [0043] - [0045]; figures 1,2,5,6 * |