EP1505290 - Fuel supply control system for engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/32] |
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Yoshikazu c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | 02 /
Utsugi, Eiichi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | 03 /
Chiba, Shosaku c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | 04 /
Sasaki, Tsutomu c/o Kakuda Development Center of Keihin Corporation 197-1Aza Nagare, Kakuda, Kakuda-shi Miyagi / JP | 05 /
Tsutsui, Katsuhiko c/o Kakuda Development Center of Keihin Corporation 197-1 Aza Nagare Kakuda Kakuda-shi Miyag / JP | [2010/31] |
Former [2005/17] | 01 /
Yamada, Yoshikazu K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | ||
02 /
Utsugi, Eiichi K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | |||
03 /
Chiba, Shosaku K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | |||
04 /
Sasaki, Tsutomu Kakuda Development Center of Keihin Corporation 197-1Aza Nagare, Kakuda, Kakuda-shi Miyagi / JP | |||
05 /
Tsutsui, Katsuhiko Kakuda Development Center of Keihin Corporation 197-1 Aza Nagare Kakuda Kakuda-shi Miyag / JP | |||
Former [2005/06] | 01 /
Yamada, Yoshikazu K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | ||
02 /
Utsugi, Eiichi K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | |||
03 /
Chiba, Shosaku K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | |||
04 /
Sasaki, Tsutomu Kakuda Development Center of Keihin Corporation 197-1 Aza Nagare Kakuda Kakuda-shi Miyag / JP | |||
05 /
Tsutsui, Katsuhiko Kakuda Development Center of Keihin Corporation 197-1 Aza Nagare Kakuda Kakuda-shi Miyag / JP | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Prechtel, Jörg, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/06] | Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04016460.0 | 13.07.2004 | [2005/06] | Priority number, date | JP20030286287 | 04.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003286287 | JP20030286293 | 04.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003286293 | JP20030286294 | 04.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003286294 | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1505290 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1505290 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F02M17/04, F02M37/20, F02M25/08 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
F02M25/0836 (EP,US);
F02M17/04 (EP,US);
F02M37/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/43] |
Former [2005/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System für die Kraftstoffzufuhr in einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2005/06] | English: | Fuel supply control system for engine | [2005/06] | French: | Système de commande d'alimentation en carburant d'un moteur à combustion interne | [2005/06] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 26.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2264190 (ROTHLISBERGER HENRI [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4153025 (THORNBURGH WILLIAM F) [A] 1 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 28; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4203401 (GIFFORD WILLIAM E [US], et al) [A] 1* column 8, line 62 - column 9, line 34; figure 8 *; | [A]US5584278 (SATOH KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 48; figure 1 * |