EP1528632 - Electrical connector for fusion coupling sleeve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hawle Armaturen GmbH Liegnitzer Str. 6 83395 Freilassing / DE | [2005/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stamm, Hans-Ulrich Waldgirmes Naunheimerstr. 53A 35633 Lahnau/Waldgirmes / DE | [2005/18] | Representative(s) | Rögner, Jürgen Schwabe Sandmair Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | Rögner, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Schwabe Sandmair Marx, Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04016658.9 | 15.07.2004 | [2005/18] | Priority number, date | DE2003216742U | 30.10.2003 Original published format: DE 20316742 U | [2005/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1528632 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1528632 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/35, F16L47/03, B29C65/34 | [2005/18] | CPC: |
H01R24/28 (EP);
H01R27/00 (EP);
H01R13/405 (EP);
H01R13/642 (EP);
H01R2101/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/18] | Extension states | HR | 31.05.2005 | Title | German: | Elektrisches Anschlussverbindungselement für Schweissschellen | [2005/18] | English: | Electrical connector for fusion coupling sleeve | [2005/18] | French: | Borne électrique pour manchon de raccord fusible | [2005/18] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 14.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.11.2009 | 09.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 14.04.2010 | DK | 14.04.2010 | EE | 14.04.2010 | FI | 14.04.2010 | IE | 14.04.2010 | IT | 14.04.2010 | NL | 14.04.2010 | PL | 14.04.2010 | RO | 14.04.2010 | SE | 14.04.2010 | SI | 14.04.2010 | SK | 14.04.2010 | TR | 14.04.2010 | CY | 21.04.2010 | BG | 14.07.2010 | GR | 15.07.2010 | LU | 15.07.2010 | ES | 25.07.2010 | BE | 31.07.2010 | CH | 31.07.2010 | LI | 31.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | PT | 16.08.2010 | HU | 15.10.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | BG | 14.04.2010 | |
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
TR | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
LU | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 14.04.2010 | |
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
LU | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 14.04.2010 | |
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 14.04.2010 | |
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CZ | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CZ | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | CZ | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | CZ | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | DK | 14.04.2010 | |
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | DK | 14.04.2010 | |
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | FI | 14.04.2010 | |
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | FI | 14.04.2010 | |
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | FI | 14.04.2010 | |
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | FI | 14.04.2010 | |
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | NL | 14.04.2010 | |
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 14.04.2010 | |
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 14.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5150923 (OHYA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract ** figure 5 *; | [X]GB2282102 (UPONOR ALDYL LTD [GB]) [X] 1-7 * page 16, lines 21-23 * * figures 11,1 * |