EP1469163 - Gas turbine moving blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/39] |
Former [2004/43] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tomita, Yasuoki, c/o Takasago Machinery Works of Mitsubishi Heavy Indust. Ltd. 1-1,Shinhama 2-chome Arai-cho, Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Hashimoto, Yukihiro, c/o Takasago Machinery Works Mitsubishi Heavy Indust. Ltd. 1-1,Shinhama 2-chome Arai-cho, Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Suenaga, Kiyoshi, c/o Takasago Machinery Works Mitsubishi Heavy Indust. Ltd. 1-1,Shinhama 2-chome Arai-cho, Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Arimura, Hisato, c/o Takasago Machinery Works of Mitsubishi Heavy Indust. Ltd. 1-1,Shinhama 2-chome Arai-cho, Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 05 /
Torii, Shunsuke, c/o Takasago Machinery Works of Mitsubishi Heavy Indust. Ltd. 1-1,Shinhama 2-chome Arai-cho, Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 06 /
Kubota, Jun, c/o Takasago Machinery Works of Mitsubishi Heavy Indust. Ltd. 1-1,Shinhama 2-chome Arai-cho, Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 07 /
Shirota, Akihiko, c/o Takasago Machinery Works of Mitsubishi Heavy Indust. Ltd. 1-1,Shinhama 2-chome Arai-cho, Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 08 /
Aoki, Sunao, c/oTakasago Research & Development of Mitsubishi Heavy Indust.Ltd 1-1,Shinhama 2-chome Arai-cho, Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 09 /
Ishiguro, Tatsuo, c/oResearch&Development Centre of Mitsubishi Heavy Indust. Ltd. 1-1,Shinhama 2-chome Arai-cho, Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04016994.8 | 13.02.2001 | [2004/43] | Priority number, date | JP20000046375 | 23.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000046375 | JP20000084988 | 24.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000084988 | [2004/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1469163 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1469163 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1469163 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18, F02C7/18 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
F01D5/20 (EP,US);
F01D5/186 (EP,US);
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F05D2240/81 (EP,US);
F05D2250/185 (EP,US);
F05D2260/22141 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/43] | F01D5/18 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2004/43] | Title | German: | Gasturbinenrotorschaufel | [2004/43] | English: | Gas turbine moving blade | [2004/43] | French: | Aube rotorique de turbine a gaz | [2004/43] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 21.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01103374.3 / EP1128024 | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 27.09.2006 | FR | 27.09.2006 | IT | 27.09.2006 | LI | 27.09.2006 | GB | 13.02.2007 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | CH | 27.09.2006 | |
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
GB | 13.02.2007 | ||
FR | 25.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CH | 27.09.2006 | |
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
GB | 13.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | CH | 27.09.2006 | |
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | CH | 27.09.2006 | |
LI | 27.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4073599 (ALLEN JAMES M, et al) [Y] 2 * figure - *; | [Y]US4815928 (PINEO FREDERICK J [US], et al) [Y] 10* figure - *; | [Y]US5857837 (ZELESKY MARK F [US], et al) [Y] 8 * figure - *; | [Y]EP0940561 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,5-7 * figure - *; | [Y]EP0945594 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,5-8,10 * figure - * |