EP1484723 - Interactive wagering system with promotions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ODS Properties, Inc. 6701 Center Drive West Los Angeles CA 90045 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states ODS Properties, Inc. 6701 Center Drive West Los Angeles, CA 90045 / US | ||
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states ODS Properties, Inc. 12421 West Olympic Boulevard Los Angeles, California 90064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marshall, Connie T. 2991 South Woodland Road Muskogee, OK 74401 / US | 02 /
Garahi, Masood 2802 North Torreys Peak Drive Superior, CO 80027 / US | 03 /
Brwon, Jodie M. 16500 MCR 26 Brush, CO 80723 / US | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/50] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04017079.7 | 30.06.2000 | [2004/50] | Priority number, date | US19990142307P | 01.07.1999 Original published format: US 142307 P | US20000522227 | 09.03.2000 Original published format: US 522227 | [2004/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1484723 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1484723 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/32 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
G07F17/32 (EP);
G07F17/3255 (EP);
G07F17/3288 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/50] | Title | German: | Interaktives System zum Wetten mit Sonderangeboten | [2004/50] | English: | Interactive wagering system with promotions | [2004/50] | French: | Système interactif de pari comprenant des promotions | [2004/50] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 28.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/49] | 20.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/49] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00946997.4 / EP1196904 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0620688 (NEWS DATACOM LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * column 9, line 37 - line 43 * * column 11, line 42 - column 12, line 14 * [Y] 3-5,11-13; | [X]WO9748230 (STARSIGHT TELECAST INC [US]) [X] 17 * page 2, line 10 - line 36 * * page 14, line 23 - line 29 * * page 21, line 17 - line 23 ** page 23, line 3 - line 29 *; | [Y]US5830068 (BRENNER MARK A [US], et al) [Y] 3-5,11-13 * column 10, line 56 - line 61 * * column 2, line 30 - line 65 * * column 10, line 63 - column 11, line 3 * * column 18, line 29 - column 19, line 27 * |