EP1508507 - Automotive floor panel structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun Hiroshima / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima / JP | ||
Former [2005/08] | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamura, Takanobu Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-Cho Aki-Gun Hiroshima / JP | 02 /
Chikita, Masaru Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-Cho Aki-Gun Hiroshima / JP | [2005/08] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/08] | Laufhütte, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04017664.6 | 26.07.2004 | [2005/08] | Priority number, date | JP20030296473 | 20.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003296473 | [2005/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1508507 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1508507 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/20 | [2005/08] | CPC: |
B62D25/20 (EP,US);
B62D21/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2005/45] |
Former [2005/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bodenplattenstruktur für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2005/08] | English: | Automotive floor panel structure | [2005/08] | French: | Structure de panneau de plancher pour vehicule | [2005/08] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 19.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH09202269 ; | [X]EP1281604 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0041] , [0042] , [0055] , [0105] , [0106] , [0114] - [0117] - [0134] , [0173]; figures 1,3,5A,5B,10,14F; claims 1,5,8 * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP09202269 A 19970805 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [AD] 1-9 * abstract * |