EP1506784 - Identification of novel factors that block programmed cell death or apoptosis by targeting JNK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO 5811 South Maryland Avenue Chicago, IL 60637 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/07] | For all designated states University of Chicago 5811 South Maryland Avenue Chicago, IL 60637 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franzoso, Guido 3660 N. Lake Shore Drive 2205 Chicago, Illinois 60613 / US | 02 /
Desmaele, Enrico Via Giovanni, XXIII, 59 00028 Subiaco, Rome / IT | 03 /
Zazzeroni, Francesca 5337 S. Hyde Park Blvd. 203 Chicago, Illinois 60615 / US | 04 /
Papa, Salvatore 5300 S. Hyde Park Blvd. Chicago, Illinois 60615 / US | 05 /
Bubici, Concetta 5300 Hyde Park Blvd. Apt. 304 Chicago, Illinois 60615 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2005/07] | 01 /
Franzoso, Guido 3660 N. Lake Shore Drive # 2205 Chicago, Illinois 60613 / US | ||
02 /
Desmaele, Enrico Via Giovanni, XXIII, 59 00028 Subiaco, Rome / IT | |||
03 /
Zazzeroni, Francesca 5337 S. Hyde Park Blvd. #203 Chicago, Illinois 60615 / US | |||
04 /
Papa, Salvatore 5300 S. Hyde Park Blvd. Chicago, Illinois 60615 / US | |||
05 /
Bubici, Concetta 5300 Hyde Park Blvd. Apt. 304 Chicago, Illinois 60615 / US | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/08] | Grund, Martin GRUND Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/07] | Grund, Martin, Dr., et al Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei, Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04017667.9 | 26.07.2004 | [2005/07] | Priority number, date | US20030626905 | 25.07.2003 Original published format: US 626905 | US20030526231P | 02.12.2003 Original published format: US 526231 P | [2005/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1506784 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, G01N33/566, C12N9/12, C07K14/47, C12N15/12 | [2005/07] | CPC: |
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61K31/7105 (EP,US);
A61K31/711 (EP,US);
A61K49/0008 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/4747 (EP,US);
C12N9/1205 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/07] | Title | German: | Identifizierung von Faktoren, die programmierten Zelltod oder Apoptose hemmen, durch Bindung des JNK | [2005/07] | English: | Identification of novel factors that block programmed cell death or apoptosis by targeting JNK | [2005/07] | French: | L'identification de facteurs bloquant la mort cellulaire programmée ou l'apoptose par ciblage de JNK | [2005/07] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2004 | Examination requested [2005/07] | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/16] | 28.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9902547 (UNIV MASSACHUSETTS [US]) [X] 1-3,5-12 * SEQ ID NO:26;; examples 23-26; claims 15-24 *; | [X]WO9933999 (CHIRON CORP [US]) [X] 4,10-12 * figure 3 *; | [X]US6054440 (MONIA BRETT P [US], et al) [X] 10-12 * SEQ ID NO: 1;; examples 15-17 *; | [X]WO03028659 (UNIV CHICAGO [US], et al) [X] 2,13-45 * claims 1-33 *; | [T] - PAPA SALVATORE ET AL, "Gadd45beta mediates the NF-kappaB suppression of JNK signalling by targeting MKK7/JNKK2.", NATURE CELL BIOLOGY, (200402), vol. 6, no. 2, ISSN 1465-7392, pages 146 - 153, XP002309803 [T] 1-45 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncb1093 |