EP1515510 - Method and system for providing multiple encryption in a multi-band multi-protocol hybrid wired/wireless network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine, California 92618-7013 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin, Richard 19097 Eagleview Drive Morgan Hill, CA 95037 / US | 02 /
Frank, Edward H. 83 Tuscaloosa Ave. Atherton, CA 94027 / US | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Jehle, Volker Armin Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/11] | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch, Graf v. Stosch, Jehle Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04018045.7 | 29.07.2004 | [2005/11] | Priority number, date | US20030658310 | 09.09.2003 Original published format: US 658310 | [2005/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1515510 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1515510 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | [2008/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1515510 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/28, H04L12/56 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
H04L12/2856 (EP,US);
H04W12/02 (US);
H04L12/2872 (EP,US);
H04L12/2874 (EP,US);
H04L47/125 (EP,US);
H04L47/15 (EP,US);
H04L47/24 (EP,US);
H04L47/2408 (EP,US);
H04L47/70 (EP,US);
H04L47/767 (EP,US);
H04L47/785 (EP,US);
H04L47/805 (EP,US);
H04L47/824 (EP,US);
H04L47/825 (EP,US);
H04L49/351 (EP,US);
H04L63/0272 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L63/0478 (EP,US);
H04L63/18 (EP,US);
H04L67/14 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
H04L67/63 (EP,US);
H04L69/324 (EP,US);
H04W12/03 (EP,US);
H04W16/16 (EP,US);
H04W8/04 (US);
H04L1/1607 (EP,US);
H04L49/205 (EP,US);
H04L63/061 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04L63/10 (EP,US);
H04L69/14 (EP,US);
H04L69/18 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
H04W12/04 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04W80/00 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/11] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/39] |
Former [2005/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Bereitstellung von Mehrfachverschlüsselung in einem hybriden drahtlosen/drahtgebundenen Multiband-, Multiprotokoll-Netzwerk | [2012/21] | English: | Method and system for providing multiple encryption in a multi-band multi-protocol hybrid wired/wireless network | [2005/11] | French: | Méthode et système pour fournir le chiffrage multiple dans un réseau multiprotocole multibande hybride filaire/sans fil | [2012/22] |
Former [2005/11] | Methode und System für das zur Verfügung stellen der mehrfachen Verschlüsselung in einem Mehrbandmehrprotokollnetz des Mischlings wired/wireless | ||
Former [2005/11] | Méthode et système pour fournir le chiffrage multiple dans un réseau multiprotocole multibande hybride wired/wireless | Examination procedure | 16.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 17.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0219614 (MYESPACE NET PRIVATE LTD [IN]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 4 - page 8 *; | [X]US2003061503 (KATZ EYAL [IL], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * figure 5 ** paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0096] *; | [X]EP1322091 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0047] * * figure 4 * |