EP1512960 - Spectroscopic determination of concentration in a rectifying column [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states Bayer Chemicals AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauschild, Thorsten, Dr. Mühlenstrasse 48 51469 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02 /
Gerlach, Martin, Dr. Friedenstrasse 17 41539 Dormagen / DE | 03 /
Tosch, Stephan, Dr. Falkenstrasse 34 45549 Sprockhövel / DE | 04 /
Frisch, Burkhard Theodor-Adorno-Strasse 24 51377 Leverkusen / DE | 05 /
Mohr, Bernd Edmund-Husserl-Strasse 11 51377 Leverkusen / DE | [2005/10] | Application number, filing date | 04018163.8 | 30.07.2004 | [2005/10] | Priority number, date | DE2003136875 | 11.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10336875 | [2005/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1512960 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1512960 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/35, B01D3/42 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
B01D3/4261 (EP,US);
G01N21/3577 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/35 (KR);
G01N21/359 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [2005/48] |
Former [2005/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Spektroskopische Konzentrationsbestimmung in einer Rektifikationskolonne | [2005/10] | English: | Spectroscopic determination of concentration in a rectifying column | [2005/10] | French: | Détermination spectroscopique de concentration dans une colonne de rectification | [2005/10] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 20.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/42] | IT | 21.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3085153 (MORGAN LYMAN W) [A] 1-4 * column 5, lines 15-21; figure . *; | [A]US3325377 (ERNST HACKIANDER) [A] 1-4 * column 4, lines 40-70; figure 2 *; | [A]WO9610009 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-4* page 11, column 23 - page 16, column 28; figure 9 *; | [DA]WO9829787 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [DA] 1-4 * page 6, line 4 - page 8, column 3; figure 3 * |