EP1502853 - Packaging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Furukawa Mfg. Co., Ltd. 19-12, Ohoi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0014 / JP | [2009/23] |
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states Furukawa Mfg. Co., Ltd. 19-12, Ohoi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-0014 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kujubu, Eitaro 1415-3 Itozakicho Mihara-shi Hiroshima 729-0324 / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Hiroshi 8-27 Yakatamachi 2-chome Mihara-shi Hiroshima 723-0004 / JP | 03 /
Kudo, Wataru 2530-2 Itozakicho Mihara-shi Hiroshima 729-0324 / JP | [2005/05] | Representative(s) | Engelhardt, Harald Le Vrang & Engelhardt Fliederstrasse 1 85139 Wettstetten / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | Engelhardt, Harald le Vrang & Engelhardt, Fliederstrasse 1 85139 Wettstetten / DE | Application number, filing date | 04018254.5 | 31.07.2004 | [2005/05] | Priority number, date | JP20030284614 | 01.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003284614 | [2005/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1502853 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1502853 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65B5/04, B65B31/02, B65B57/02, B65B25/06 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
B65B31/046 (EP,US);
B65B25/065 (EP,US);
B65B39/02 (EP,US);
B65B43/28 (EP,US);
B65B5/045 (EP,US);
B65B57/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT [2005/42] |
Former [2005/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verpackungsanordnung | [2005/05] | English: | Packaging system | [2005/05] | French: | Système d'emballage | [2005/05] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 02.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3552090 (ROBERTS JOHN T, et al) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]US4419854 (OKADA SHINGO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US5483786 (GIESBRECHT KEN [CA], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 47; figures 7a-7e *; | [A]US5692360 (MCDONALD GREGORY E [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * figures 38a-38h *; | [A]US2002014054 (DHARSSI FATEHALI T [CA], et al) [A] 1-6 * figures 6-9 *; | [PX]EP1394044 (FURUKAWA SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [PX] 1-6 * paragraphs [0025] - [0031]; figures 1,2,15,17; claim 6 * |