EP1624299 - Method for determining the parameters of a gaselectrode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hach Lange GmbH Königsweg 10 14163 Berlin / DE | [2006/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Battefeld, Manfred Schineklstrasse 54 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
Bittner, Klaus Kemmerhofstrasse 244 47802 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
Golitz, Andreas Jungbornstrasse 4 47445 Moers / DE | 04 /
Hahn, Markus, Dr. Terwelpstrasse 4 47906 Kempen / DE | 05 /
Kussmann, Michael Frankenstrasse 35 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | 06 /
Stellmach-Hanulok, Aurelia Koxhof 40 42489 Wülfrath / DE | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | Eberlein-Van Hoof, Jasper, et al Ter Smitten Eberlein Rütten Patentanwälte Postfach 27 03 63 40526 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/41] | Eberlein, Jasper, et al Ter Smitten Eberlein Rütten Patentanwälte Postfach 27 03 63 40526 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/11] | Eberlein, Jasper, et al Patentanwälte ter Smitten Postfach 27 03 63 40526 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/06] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Patentanwälte P.O. Box 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 04018344.4 | 03.08.2004 | [2006/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1624299 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1624299 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/416, G01N27/30, G01N27/38 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
G01N27/4163 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/41] |
Former [2006/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung von Parametern einer gasselektiven Elektrode | [2006/06] | English: | Method for determining the parameters of a gaselectrode | [2006/06] | French: | Procédé pour déterminer les paramètres d'une électrode sensible aux gaz | [2006/06] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 19.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.08.2004 | CY | 12.10.2016 | CZ | 12.10.2016 | DK | 12.10.2016 | EE | 12.10.2016 | ES | 12.10.2016 | FI | 12.10.2016 | IT | 12.10.2016 | MC | 12.10.2016 | NL | 12.10.2016 | PL | 12.10.2016 | RO | 12.10.2016 | SE | 12.10.2016 | SI | 12.10.2016 | SK | 12.10.2016 | TR | 12.10.2016 | BG | 12.01.2017 | GR | 13.01.2017 | PT | 13.02.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 03.08.2004 | |
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 03.08.2004 | |
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | CZ | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 12.10.2016 | |
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/29] | ES | 12.10.2016 | |
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP6130030 ; | [A]GB1535361 (OWENS ILLINOIS INC) [A] 1* page 2, line 128 - page 3, line 110 *; | [Y]US5016201 (BRYAN AVRON I [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 60 *; | [A]DE3937635 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0667522 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940805), vol. 0184, no. 20, Database accession no. (P - 1782), & JP6130030 A 19940513 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * | by applicant | US5016210 |