EP1473330 - Process for the synthesis of oxonol compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2007/07] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | ||
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishigaki, Junji c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Deguchi, Yasuaki c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | [2004/45] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04018506.8 | 17.07.1997 | [2004/45] | Priority number, date | JP19960206527 | 17.07.1996 Original published format: JP 20652796 | JP19960235893 | 19.08.1996 Original published format: JP 23589396 | JP19970055315 | 10.03.1997 Original published format: JP 5531597 | [2004/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1473330 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1473330 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C09B23/00, C09B23/06, C09B23/08 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
C09B23/0008 (EP);
C09B23/06 (EP);
C09B23/083 (EP);
G03C1/18 (EP);
G03C1/20 (EP);
G03C1/832 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Synthese einer Oxonolverbindung | [2004/45] | English: | Process for the synthesis of oxonol compound | [2004/45] | French: | Procédé de synthèse de composé oxonol | [2004/45] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 08.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97112271.8 / EP0819977 | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2007 | BE | 14.02.2007 | CH | 14.02.2007 | DK | 14.02.2007 | FI | 14.02.2007 | IT | 14.02.2007 | LI | 14.02.2007 | NL | 14.02.2007 | SE | 14.05.2007 | GR | 15.05.2007 | ES | 25.05.2007 | PT | 16.07.2007 | IE | 17.07.2007 | LU | 17.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | [2012/25] |
Former [2009/40] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
IT | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
ES | 25.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
IE | 17.07.2007 | ||
LU | 17.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
IT | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
ES | 25.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
IE | 17.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
IT | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
ES | 25.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
ES | 25.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
ES | 25.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | CH | 14.02.2007 | |
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
ES | 25.05.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0679939 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 8, line 39 - line 41; claims 1-10 *; | [D]JPH0850346 (EASTMAN KODAK CO) |