EP1511145 - Channel for floor structure installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tehalit GmbH Seebergstrasse 37 67716 Heltersberg / DE | [2005/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kauf, Peter Fahrenbergstrasse 17 66482 Zweibrücken / DE | 02 /
Schneckmann, Horst Am Hohenrech 7 67705 Trippstadt / DE | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Dr. Keller, Schwertfeger Partnerschaft mbB Westring 17 76829 Landau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Patentanwälte Möll und Bitterich Westring 17 76829 Landau/Pfalz / DE | Application number, filing date | 04018657.9 | 06.08.2004 | [2005/09] | Priority number, date | DE2003213160U | 26.08.2003 Original published format: DE 20313160 U | [2005/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1511145 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1511145 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/38 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
H02G3/0425 (EP);
H02G3/283 (EP);
H02G3/383 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2007/26] |
Former [2005/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Im Bodenaufbau verlegbarer Kanal | [2005/09] | English: | Channel for floor structure installation | [2005/09] | French: | Canalisation pour installation dans une structure de sol | [2005/09] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/04] | 17.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.05.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.05.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE7343069U (BETTERMANN ELEKTRO OHG) [X] 1,2,5,6 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0812045 (SCHLETTER LUDWIG [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 2 *; | [X]DE29808767U (SCHLUETER SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 3 *; | [X]EP1043822 (POLYNORM BOUWPRODUKTEN B V [NL]) [X] 1-4,6* figures 1,2 * |