EP1477162 - Controlled-release formulations coated with aqueous dispersions of ethylcellulose [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.08.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2015 | Revocation of patent | published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EURO-CELTIQUE S.A. 2, avenue Charles de Gaulle 1653 Luxembourg / LU | [2008/23] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Euro-Celtique S.A. 122 Boulevard de la Pétrusse 2330 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oshlack, Benjamin 351 East 84th Street New York NY 10028 / US | 02 /
Chasin, Mark 3 Turnberry Drive Monroe, NJ 08831 / US | 03 /
Pedi, Frank Jr. 2773 Hyatt Street Yorktown Heights New York, N.Y. 10598 / US | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof, Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04018826.0 | 14.06.1994 | [2004/47] | Priority number, date | US19930081618 | 23.06.1993 Original published format: US 81618 | [2004/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1477162 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1477162 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K31/485, A61P25/04 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
A61K9/167 (EP,US);
A61K47/38 (FI);
A61K31/522 (EP,US);
A61K9/2866 (EP,US);
A61K9/5078 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/47] | Extension states | SI | 09.08.2004 | Title | German: | Formulierungen mit kontrollierter Abgabe überzogen mit wässrigen Dispersionen von Ethylcellulose | [2004/47] | English: | Controlled-release formulations coated with aqueous dispersions of ethylcellulose | [2004/47] | French: | Formulations à libération controlée enrobées avec dispersions aqueuses d'ethylcellulose. | [2004/47] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 16.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.02.2006 | 08.02.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.02.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01130255.1 / EP1203581 | EP94109115.9 / EP0630646 | Divisional application(s) | EP08162715.0 / EP2018852 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.06.2009
18.08.2011
WITHDRAWN Acino Pharma AG Erlenstrasse 1 4058 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Best, Michael, et al, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.06.2009
18.08.2011
WITHDRAWN Acino Pharma AG Erlenstrasse 1 4058 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Best, Michael, et al, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.06.2009
Acino Pharma AG Erlenstrasse 1 4058 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Best, Michael, et al, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | 30.07.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.11.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.02.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.03.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 30.07.2015 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/39] | Appeal following opposition | 29.04.2011 | Appeal received No. T0940/11 | 11.07.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.07.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 13.06.2014 | IE | 14.06.2014 | ES | 15.06.2014 | DE | 17.06.2014 | PT | 25.06.2014 | [2014/50] |
Former [2014/48] | GB | 13.06.2014 | |
IE | 14.06.2014 | ||
DE | 17.06.2014 | ||
PT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | GB | 13.06.2014 | |
DE | 17.06.2014 | ||
PT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | GB | 13.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]EP0553392 (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU]) [AP] 1-7* the whole document * |