EP1506706 - Handheld device with electric drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GARDENA Manufacturing GmbH Hans-Lorenser-Strasse 40 89079 Ulm / DE | [2005/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kohl, Peter Von-Kleist-Strasse 10 89257 Illertissen / DE | 02 /
Schneider, Regina Holderstrasse 15 89250 Senden / DE | [2005/07] | Application number, filing date | 04019033.2 | 11.08.2004 | [2005/07] | Priority number, date | DE2003137355 | 14.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10337355 | [2005/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1506706 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1506706 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A01G3/06, B25F5/00 | [2005/07] | CPC: |
A01G3/067 (EP);
A01G3/053 (EP);
H01H9/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/07] | Title | German: | Handhaltbares Gerät mit elektromotorischem Antrieb | [2005/07] | English: | Handheld device with electric drive | [2005/07] | French: | Dispositif portatif entraîné par moteur électrique | [2005/07] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 31.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.02.2008 | EE | 13.02.2008 | FI | 13.02.2008 | IE | 13.02.2008 | IT | 13.02.2008 | RO | 13.02.2008 | SI | 13.02.2008 | SK | 13.02.2008 | TR | 13.02.2008 | BG | 13.05.2008 | GR | 14.05.2008 | ES | 24.05.2008 | PT | 14.07.2008 | LU | 11.08.2008 | HU | 14.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
TR | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
LU | 11.08.2008 | ||
HU | 14.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
LU | 11.08.2008 | ||
HU | 14.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
LU | 11.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | EE | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | EE | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | FI | 13.02.2008 | |
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 13.02.2008 | |
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | FI | 13.02.2008 | |
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 13.02.2008 | |
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 13.02.2008 | |
ES | 24.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3759020 (SIMMONS F) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [A]US3861127 (RITUMS MIKELIS, et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US4207675 (BURCHELL CLARENCE [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US4707921 (MEYER BURTON C [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |