EP1508715 - Actuation device for a twin clutch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
Former [2005/08] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pagels, Olaf Dechelmannstrasse 1 97493 Bergrheinfeld / DE | 02 /
Heiartz, Markus Sterntalerweg 127 97084 Würzburg / DE | 03 /
Conrad, Matthias Am Stutz 8 97273 Kürnach / DE | [2005/08] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/43] |
Former [2009/36] | Ruttensperger, Bernhard Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04019139.7 | 12.08.2004 | [2005/08] | Priority number, date | DE2003137960 | 19.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10337960 | [2005/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1508715 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1508715 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1508715 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/16] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1508715 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16D23/12, F16D21/06 | [2005/08] | CPC: |
F16D21/06 (EP);
F16D23/12 (EP);
F16D2021/0607 (EP);
F16D2021/0684 (EP);
F16D2023/141 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/08] | Title | German: | Betätigungseinrichtung zur Betätigung der Kupplungsbereiche einer Doppelkupplung | [2005/08] | English: | Actuation device for a twin clutch | [2005/08] | French: | Dispositif d'actionnement d'un embrayage double | [2005/08] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 27.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.12.2008
07.01.2009
ADMISSIBLE LuK Vermögensverwaltungsgesellschaft mbH Industriestrasse 3 77815 Bühl / DE | [2010/48] |
Former [2009/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.12.2008
LuK Lamellen und Kupplungsbau Beteiligungs KG Industriestrasse 3 77815 Bühl / DE | 09.03.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.08.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.10.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.11.2010 | 24.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.03.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.04.2011 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 21.09.2011 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.04.2008 | CZ | 16.04.2008 | DK | 16.04.2008 | EE | 16.04.2008 | FI | 16.04.2008 | IE | 16.04.2008 | IT | 16.04.2008 | NL | 16.04.2008 | PL | 16.04.2008 | RO | 16.04.2008 | SI | 16.04.2008 | SK | 16.04.2008 | TR | 16.04.2008 | BG | 16.07.2008 | SE | 16.07.2008 | GR | 17.07.2008 | ES | 27.07.2008 | AT | 12.08.2008 | GB | 12.08.2008 | LU | 12.08.2008 | BE | 31.08.2008 | CH | 31.08.2008 | LI | 31.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | PT | 16.09.2008 | HU | 17.10.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 16.04.2008 | |
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
TR | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
AT | 12.08.2008 | ||
GB | 12.08.2008 | ||
LU | 12.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
HU | 17.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 16.04.2008 | |
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
AT | 12.08.2008 | ||
GB | 12.08.2008 | ||
LU | 12.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
HU | 17.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 16.04.2008 | |
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
AT | 12.08.2008 | ||
GB | 12.08.2008 | ||
LU | 12.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CY | 16.04.2008 | |
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
AT | 12.08.2008 | ||
GB | 12.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/50] | CY | 16.04.2008 | |
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
AT | 12.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/44] | CY | 16.04.2008 | |
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CZ | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/32] | CZ | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | CZ | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | CZ | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 16.04.2008 | |
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 16.04.2008 | |
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 16.04.2008 | |
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | SI | 16.04.2008 | |
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 16.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1037523 (S.A. FRANÇAISE DU FERODO) [X] 1,4,5,7-10 * page 2, line 42 - page 3, line 51; figures 2,3,6 *; | [X]DE1505577 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [X] 1,4-8 * page 12, line 1 - line 34; figure 6 *; | [X]US3892302 (RIST MICHEL) [X] 1,4-8,11 * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 30; figures 1-4 *; | [PX]WO03081069 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE], et al) [PX] 1,4-11* figures 9-14,23-25 * | by applicant | DE3138208 | Opposition | DE7637760U | DE7306062U | DE887589 | DE3138208 | DE3418772 | DE10000893 | DE10036675 |