EP1523952 - Dental restoration piece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ivoclar Vivadent AG Bendererstrasse 2 9494 Schaan / LI | [2017/52] |
Former [2005/16] | For all designated states Firma Ivoclar Vivadent AG Bendererstrasse 2 9494 Schaan / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foser, Hans-Peter Stötz 15 9496 Balzers / LI | 02 /
Spirig, Urs Junkerriet 6 9496 Blazers / LI | [2005/16] | Representative(s) | Baronetzky, Klaus, et al Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [2017/52] |
Former [2005/16] | Baronetzky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04019180.1 | 12.08.2004 | [2005/16] | Priority number, date | DE20031048369 | 17.10.2003 Original published format: DE 10348369 | [2005/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1523952 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1523952 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | [2006/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1523952 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/09 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
A61C13/09 (EP,US);
A61C5/77 (EP,US);
A61C13/097 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/16] | A61C5/09, A61C5/10, A61C13/00, A61C13/09 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/52] |
Former [2005/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zahnrestaurationsteil | [2005/16] | English: | Dental restoration piece | [2005/16] | French: | Elément de restauration dentaire | [2005/16] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 13.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.11.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 17.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2006 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.08.2004 | CY | 27.12.2017 | CZ | 27.12.2017 | DK | 27.12.2017 | EE | 27.12.2017 | ES | 27.12.2017 | FI | 27.12.2017 | MC | 27.12.2017 | NL | 27.12.2017 | PL | 27.12.2017 | PT | 27.12.2017 | RO | 27.12.2017 | SI | 27.12.2017 | SK | 27.12.2017 | TR | 27.12.2017 | BG | 27.03.2018 | GR | 28.03.2018 | IE | 12.08.2018 | LU | 12.08.2018 | BE | 31.08.2018 | [2020/28] |
Former [2020/16] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IE | 12.08.2018 | ||
LU | 12.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IE | 12.08.2018 | ||
LU | 12.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IE | 12.08.2018 | ||
LU | 12.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 12.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/42] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/26] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 27.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4398887 (BALDE JOHN W [US], et al) [X] 20 * column 2, lines 8-17 * * claim 5 * * figure 1 *; | [A]FR2577796 (TOUATI BERNARD [FR]) [A] 1,12,13* abstract *; | [XA]US4828117 (PANZERA CARLINO [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-14,16-18 * column 10, lines 11-24 * * column 10, line 43 - column 11, line 62 * * figures 2,3 * [A] 4; | [X]DE4133690 (KOERBER KARLHEINZ [DE], et al) [X] 1,15,18,19 * claims 1-7 * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE19628930 (HERAEUS KULZER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,12,13,20,23,24,28,29 * column 4, lines 9-12,22-31 * | by applicant | DE4133690 | DE19850451 |