EP1508612 - Cell scraper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes New Jersey 07417-1880 / US | ||
Former [2005/08] | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muser, Andrew P. 513 Nantahala Drive Durham NC 27713 / US | [2005/08] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/08] | Weber, Thomas, Dr.Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 04019342.7 | 14.08.2004 | [2005/08] | Priority number, date | US20030496464P | 20.08.2003 Original published format: US 496464 P | US20040912915 | 06.08.2004 Original published format: US 912915 | [2005/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1508612 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1508612 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/26, B01L3/18 | [2005/08] | CPC: |
B01L3/18 (EP,US);
C12M33/00 (EP,US);
G01N2001/028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2005/45] |
Former [2005/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zellenabstreifer | [2005/08] | English: | Cell scraper | [2005/08] | French: | Racleur de cellules | [2005/08] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 24.08.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.12.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.10.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.10.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.10.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 05.10.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.10.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 05.10.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.10.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.10.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.10.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.10.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.10.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.10.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.10.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.10.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.10.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.10.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.10.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 05.10.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.10.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.10.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.10.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE475414 (HANS LIEWIG FA ING) [A] 1* figure -; claim - *; | [A]US3411723 (KOHN JOSEPH D) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE9006543U (WITEG-GLASGERÄTE HELMUT ANTLINGER KG) [A] 1,13,17 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US6194199 (ASA DAVID [US]) [A] 1,13,17 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2002120214 (COLE ROBERT B [US]) [A] 1,12,15 * claims 1,10 * |