EP1568498 - Fluid ejection device metal layer layouts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bruce, Kevin 2733 SW Morris Ave Corvallis, OR 97333 / US | 02 /
Torgerson, Joseph M. 24901 Hidden Valley Road P.O. Box 132 Philomath, OR 97370 / US | 03 /
Benjamin, Trudy 11251 NE San Rafael Portland, OR 97220 / US | 04 /
Miller, Michael D. 34258 Iris Circle Philomath, OR 97370 / US | [2011/51] |
Former [2005/35] | 01 /
Bruce, Kevin 2733 SW Morris Ave Corvallis, OR 97333 / US | ||
02 /
Torgerson, Joseph M. 24901 Hidden Valley Road, P.O. Box 132 Philomath, OR 97370 / US | |||
03 /
Benjamin, Trudy 11251 NE San Rafael Portland, OR 97220 / US | |||
04 /
Miller, Michael D. 34258 Iris Circle Philomath, OR 97370 / US | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04019439.1 | 16.08.2004 | [2005/35] | Priority number, date | US20040787573 | 25.02.2004 Original published format: US 787573 | [2005/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1568498 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1568498 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1568498 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/14 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
B41J2/04543 (EP,US);
A47J43/283 (KR);
B41J2/04548 (EP,US);
B41J2/0458 (EP,US);
B41J2/14072 (EP,US);
A47J45/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/34] |
Former [2005/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anordnung metallischer Schichten in einer Flüssigkeitsausstossvorrichtung | [2005/35] | English: | Fluid ejection device metal layer layouts | [2005/35] | French: | Disposition de couches métalliques d'un dispostif d'éjection de fluide | [2005/35] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 22.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0661162 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 10 * column 22, line 49 - column 23, line 10; figure 32 *; | [X]US5877791 (LEE HO JUN [KR], et al) [X] 8,9 * column 6, line 13 - line 37 * * column 9, line 1 - line 20 * * figures 4C,5A,7C,8A *; | [X]US5969392 (HAWKINS WILLIAM G [US], et al) [X] 10 * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 7 * * figure 3 *; | [X]EP1205304 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 8 * paragraphs [0029] , [0036] , [0037] * * figures 1,4 *; | [A]WO02074545 (OLIVETTI I JET SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 18, line 10 - page 35, line 6; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US6485132 (HIROKI TOMOYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 10* column 9, line 52 - line 64; figure 8 *; | [X]EP1352744 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0029] , [0033]; figure 2 *; | [X]US2003222947 (TOMOZAWA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0318] , [0325] , [0329]; figure 7 * |