EP1480255 - Thin-plate supporting container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miraial Co., Ltd. 18-2, Nishi-Ikebukuro 1-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states Miraial Co., Ltd. 18-2, Nishi-Ikebukuro 1-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kakizaki, Takeyoshi Miraial Co., Ltd. 1-18-2 Nishi-Ikebukuro Toshima-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hyobu, Yukihiro Miraial Co., Ltd. 1-18-2 Nishi-Ikebukuro Toshima-ku Tokyo / JP | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04019623.0 | 19.02.1996 | [2004/48] | Priority number, date | JP19950159136 | 26.06.1995 Original published format: JP 15913695 | JP19950210552 | 18.08.1995 Original published format: JP 21055295 | JP19950210553 | 18.08.1995 Original published format: JP 21055395 | JP19950691595U | 07.07.1995 Original published format: JP 69159595 U | [2004/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1480255 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1480255 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00, B65D25/10, B29C45/17 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
H01L21/6732 (EP,US);
H01L21/67326 (EP,US);
H01L21/67383 (EP,US);
H01L21/67386 (EP,US);
B29C45/1704 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/48] | H01L21/00, B65D25/10 | Designated contracting states | DE [2005/35] |
Former [2004/48] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Stützbehälter für dünne Scheiben | [2004/48] | English: | Thin-plate supporting container | [2004/48] | French: | Conteneur support de plaques minces | [2004/48] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/16] | 28.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FR, GB | 25.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/49] | 21.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/49] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96102467.6 / EP0751551 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.07.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH04179146 ; | [X]JPS63293849 ; | [X]US4043451 (JOHNSON DOUGLAS M) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]US4135625 (MERRILL KENNETH V) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 29 * * column 3, line 12 - line 64 *; | [X]US4762689 (FREY ALFRED [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]EP0289230 (CINPRES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]EP0571678 (EMPAK INC [US]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * column 8, line 32 - column 9, line 13 *; | [E]EP0775566 (SHINETSU POLYMER CO [JP], et al) [E] 1,2* abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921009), vol. 016, no. 488, Database accession no. (E - 1277), & JP04179146 A 19920625 (TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890328), vol. 013, no. 126, Database accession no. (E - 734), & JP63293849 A 19881130 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * |