EP1510276 - Pannel cutting machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Naldi, Valter Via Cavallina, 10 40137 Bologna / IT | [2005/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/09] | Application number, filing date | 04019658.6 | 19.08.2004 | [2005/09] | Priority number, date | IT2003BO00501 | 27.08.2003 Original published format: IT BO20030501 | [2005/09] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1510276 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1510276 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1510276 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B23D47/04, B27B5/065 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
B27B5/065 (EP,US);
B23D47/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Title | German: | Plattensägemaschine | [2005/09] | English: | Pannel cutting machine | [2005/09] | French: | Machine à couper des panneaux | [2005/09] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 27.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2007
22.10.2008
WITHDRAWN HOLZMA Plattenaufteiltechnik GmbH Holzmastrasse 3 75365 Calw-Holzbronn / DE Opponent's representative Knapp, Thomas Dreiss Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstrasse 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2007
10.01.2008
WITHDRAWN HOLZMA Plattenaufteiltechnik GmbH Holzmastrasse 3 75365 Calw-Holzbronn / DE Opponent's representative Knapp, Thomas Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2007
10.01.2008
ADMISSIBLE HOLZMA Plattenaufteiltechnik GmbH Holzmastrasse 3 75365 Calw-Holzbronn / DE Opponent's representative Knapp, Thomas Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2007
10.01.2008
ADMISSIBLE HOLZMA Plattenaufteiltechnik GmbH Holzmastrasse 3 75365 Calw-Holzbronn / DE Opponent's representative Knapp, Thomas Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | 04.02.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.07.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.10.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.12.2008 | 22.10.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 13.11.2008 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2009/13] | 17.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.03.2007 | CH | 28.03.2007 | CY | 28.03.2007 | CZ | 28.03.2007 | DK | 28.03.2007 | EE | 28.03.2007 | FI | 28.03.2007 | LI | 28.03.2007 | NL | 28.03.2007 | PL | 28.03.2007 | RO | 28.03.2007 | SI | 28.03.2007 | SK | 28.03.2007 | TR | 28.03.2007 | BG | 28.06.2007 | SE | 28.06.2007 | GR | 29.06.2007 | LU | 19.08.2007 | IE | 20.08.2007 | PT | 28.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | HU | 29.09.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | BE | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
CY | 28.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
BG | 28.06.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
LU | 19.08.2007 | ||
IE | 20.08.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
CY | 28.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
IE | 20.08.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | BE | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
IE | 20.08.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | BE | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
IE | 20.08.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | BE | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | BE | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | BE | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | BE | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | BE | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | BE | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | FI | 28.03.2007 | |
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | FI | 28.03.2007 | |
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
PL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4065991 (BENUZZI GINO) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 36-45 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4676132 (JENKNER DETLEF [DE]) [A] 1* column W *; | [XA]DE3737228 (SCHELLING & CO [AT]) [X] 1,2 * column 4, lines 9-46 * * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 18 * * column 5, lines 25-37,61-68 * * column 6, lines 12-21,43-46 * * figure - * [A] 3,4,7; | [A]DE3814177 (SCHELLING & CO [AT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5205705 (JENKNER ERWIN [DE]) [A] 1 * column W * |