EP1515159 - Method for reducing the doppler centroid for coherent pulsed radar system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. Linder Höhe 51147 Köln / DE | [2006/24] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. Südstrasse 125 53175 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fiedler, Hauke, Dr. Waldfriedhofstrasse 91 81377 München / DE | 02 /
Börner, Elke, Dipl.-Ing. Neustädter Strasse 4 98667 Schönbrunn / DE | 03 /
Mittermayer, Josef, Dr. Am Loferfeld 11 81249 München / DE | 04 /
Krieger, Gerhard, Dr. Josef-von-Hirsch-Strasse 21 82152 Planegg / DE | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Patentanwälte P.O. Box 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/17] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2005/11] | von Kirschbaum, Albrecht, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Postfach 15 20 82102 Germering / DE | Application number, filing date | 04019660.2 | 19.08.2004 | [2005/11] | Priority number, date | DE2003141893 | 09.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10341893 | [2005/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1515159 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1515159 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/90 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
G01S13/904 (EP,US);
G01S13/882 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/49] |
Former [2005/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verringerung des Dopplerzentroids bei einem kohärenten Impuls-Radarsystem | [2005/11] | English: | Method for reducing the doppler centroid for coherent pulsed radar system | [2005/11] | French: | Méthode pour réduire le centroide doppler pour des systèmes radar coherent à impulsion | [2005/11] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/42] | 17.09.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.10.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - CHANG C Y ET AL, "Attitude Steering For Space Shuttle Based Synthetic Aperture Radars", INTERNATIONAL SPACE YEAR : SPACE REMOTE SENSING. HOUSTON, MAY 26 - 29, 1992, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL GEOSCIENCE AND REMOTE SENSING SYMPOSIUM (IGARSS), NEW YORK, IEE, US, (19920526), VOL. 1 SYMP. 12, ISBN 0-7803-0138-2, pages 297 - 301, XP010101054 [X] 1-3,7-14 * abstract * * page 298, column L, line 1 - page 299, column L, line 23 * [Y] 6 | [Y] - D'ERRICO M ET AL, "The BISSAT mission: a bistatic SAR operating in formation with COSMO/SkyMed X-band radar 12", IEEE, (20020309), vol. 2, pages 809 - 818, XP010604549 [Y] 6 * Gleichung (1); pages 2-811, column L, paragraphs 2,3 * | [A] - BOERNER E ET AL, "Evaluation of TerraSAR-X spotlight processing accuracy based on a new spotlight raw data simulator", IGARSS 2003. IEEE 2003 INTERNATIONAL GEOSCIENCE AND REMOTE SENSING SYMPOSIUM. PROCEEDINGS. TOULOUSE, FRANCE, JULY 21 - 25, 2003, IEEE INTERNATIONAL GEOSCIENCE AND REMOTE SENSING SYMPOSIUM, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030721), VOL 7 OF 7, ISBN 0-7803-7929-2, pages 1323 - 1325, XP010703735 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IGARSS.2003.1294096 | [A] - RUNGE H, "Benefits Of Antenna Yaw Steering For SAR", GEOSCIENCE AND REMOTE SENSING SYMPOSIUM, 1991. IGARSS '91. REMOTE SENSING: GLOBAL MONITORING FOR EARTH MANAGEMENT., INTERNATIONAL JUNE 3-6, 1991, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19910603), ISBN 0-87942-675-6, pages 257 - 261, XP010040985 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |