EP1526515 - Hard disk drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Global Storage Technologies B. V. Locatellikade 1 1076 AZ Amsterdam / NL | [2008/30] |
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Hitachi Global Storage Technologies B. V. Locatellikade 1 01 AZ Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumgart, Peter Michael 5833 Newgate Court San Jose California 95138 / US | 02 /
Knigge, Bernhard 776 Dubanski Drive San Jose California 95123 / US | 03 /
Mate, Mathew 1672 Hester Ave. San Jose California 95128 / US | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, et al Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, et al Puschmann & Borchert Patentanwälte Bajuwarenring 21 82041 Oberhaching / DE | ||
Former [2006/39] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, et al Kirschner & Kollegen Südliche Münchnerstrasse 53 82031 Grünwald / DE | ||
Former [2005/17] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Phys. advotec. Böck, Tappe, Kirschner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 38 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04020067.7 | 24.08.2004 | [2005/17] | Priority number, date | US20030691752 | 22.10.2003 Original published format: US 691752 | [2005/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1526515 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1526515 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | [2006/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1526515 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/60 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
G11B5/6005 (EP,KR,US);
G11B5/3106 (EP);
G11B5/4826 (KR);
G11B5/4873 (KR);
G11B5/6035 (EP);
G11B5/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/29] |
Former [2005/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Festplattenlaufwerk | [2005/17] | English: | Hard disk drive | [2005/17] | French: | Unité de disque dur | [2005/17] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 21.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US6366416 (MEYER DALLAS W [US], et al) [DA] 1-12 * column 8, line 65 - column 9, line 2 *; | [DA]US6529342 (FENG ZHU [US], et al) [DA] 1-12* column 4, line 39 - line 41 * |