EP1512793 - Paving block [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRONIMUS AG Josef-Herrmann-Strasse 4-6 76473 Iffezheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states KRONIMUS AG Josef-Hermann-Strasse 4-6 76473 Iffezheim / DE | ||
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states Kronimus AG Josef-Hermann-Strasse 4-6 76473 Iffezheim / DE | ||
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states KRONIMUS AG Josef-Herrmann-Strasse 4-6 76473 Iffezheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kronimus, Martin Josef-Hermann-Strasse 4-6 76473 Iffezheim / DE | [2005/10] | Representative(s) | Otten, Herbert Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Berg/Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | Otten, Herbert Patentanwälte Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04020358.0 | 27.08.2004 | [2005/10] | Priority number, date | DE2003140594 | 01.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10340594 | DE2003216235U | 20.10.2003 Original published format: DE 20316235 U | [2005/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1512793 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1512793 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | [2005/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1512793 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E01C5/06 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
E01C11/229 (EP);
E01C5/00 (EP);
E01C2201/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/10] | Title | German: | Pflasterstein | [2005/10] | English: | Paving block | [2005/10] | French: | Pierre à pavé | [2005/10] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 07.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.07.2008 | CZ | 16.07.2008 | DK | 16.07.2008 | EE | 16.07.2008 | FI | 16.07.2008 | IE | 16.07.2008 | IT | 16.07.2008 | NL | 16.07.2008 | PL | 16.07.2008 | RO | 16.07.2008 | SI | 16.07.2008 | SK | 16.07.2008 | TR | 16.07.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | BG | 16.10.2008 | GB | 16.10.2008 | SE | 16.10.2008 | GR | 17.10.2008 | ES | 27.10.2008 | PT | 16.12.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 16.07.2008 | |
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
PL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
TR | 16.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
GB | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 16.07.2008 | |
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
PL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
GB | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/24] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
PL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
GB | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/09] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
GB | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
GB | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 16.07.2008 | |
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | DK | 16.07.2008 | |
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 16.07.2008 | |
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 16.07.2008 | |
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | FI | 16.07.2008 | |
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 16.07.2008 | |
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 16.07.2008 | |
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO0159217 (SF KOOP GMBH BETON KONZEPTE [DE], et al) [DA] 1,3,4* the whole document * | by applicant | WO0159217 |