EP1510735 - Sealing gasket with flexible stopper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2007/43] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Novil, Martin 19275 Meadowbrook Northville, MI 48167 / US | 02 /
Kong, Yingjie 2068 Crowndale Lane Canton, MI 48188 / US | 03 /
Anderson, Scott M. 2109 Stanton Street Canton, MI 48188 / US | 04 /
Wangerow, Ronald W. 44645 Dunbarton Drive Novi, MI 48375 / US | [2005/09] | Application number, filing date | 04020377.0 | 27.08.2004 | [2005/09] | Priority number, date | US20030699901 | 03.11.2003 Original published format: US 699901 | US20030650339 | 28.08.2003 Original published format: US 650339 | [2005/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1510735 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1510735 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | [2005/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1510735 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/08 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
F16J15/0818 (EP,US);
F16J15/0825 (EP,US);
F16J2015/0856 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Title | German: | Dichtung mit flexiblem Stopper | [2005/09] | English: | Sealing gasket with flexible stopper | [2005/09] | French: | Joint d'étanchéité avec butée flexible | [2005/09] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 05.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.10.2007 | BE | 24.10.2007 | CH | 24.10.2007 | CY | 24.10.2007 | CZ | 24.10.2007 | DK | 24.10.2007 | EE | 24.10.2007 | FI | 24.10.2007 | LI | 24.10.2007 | NL | 24.10.2007 | PL | 24.10.2007 | RO | 24.10.2007 | SI | 24.10.2007 | SK | 24.10.2007 | TR | 24.10.2007 | BG | 24.01.2008 | SE | 24.01.2008 | GR | 25.01.2008 | ES | 04.02.2008 | PT | 24.03.2008 | HU | 25.04.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
CY | 24.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
EE | 24.10.2007 | ||
FI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
RO | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
SK | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
GR | 25.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
HU | 25.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
CY | 24.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
EE | 24.10.2007 | ||
FI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
RO | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
SK | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
GR | 25.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
EE | 24.10.2007 | ||
FI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
RO | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
SK | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
GR | 25.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
FI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
RO | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
SK | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
GR | 25.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
FI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
RO | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
SK | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
GR | 25.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
RO | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
SK | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CH | 24.10.2007 | |
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 24.10.2007 | |
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0989114 ; | [X]EP0695896 (NIPPON GASKET KK [JP]) [X] 1-26,28-56,58 * abstract * * figures 4,5,10-12 *; | [X]EP0845621 (NIPPON GASKET KK [JP]) [X] 31-56,58 * abstract ** figures 1,5,9-11 *; | [X]US5791659 (TAKADA KAZUKUNI [JP], et al) [X] 1-26,28-56,58 * abstract * * figures 2,6,9,10,12 *; | [X]US6164662 (UEMURA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-26,28-56,58 * abstract * * figures 1,10,12 *; | [X]US6371489 (COMBET ALEXIS [FR], et al) [X] 1-28 * abstract * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2002105148 (HEILIG MARKUS [DE], et al) [X] 1-26,28-56,58 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 07, & JP09089114 A 19970331 (NIPPON GASKET CO LTD) [A] 1-26,28 * abstract * * figures 1-10 * |