EP1510570 - Method for producing L-histidine using bacteria of enterobacteriaceae family [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [2014/30] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klyachko, Elena Vitalievna ul. Ostozhenka, 1/9 Apt.3 119034 Moscow / RU | 02 /
Shakulov, Rustem Saidovich Leninskiy prospect, 91 Apt.223 117313 Moscow / RU | 03 /
Kozlov, Yuri Ivanovich ul. Golubinskaya, 7 bldg. 2 Apt.178 117574 Moscow / RU | [2014/30] |
Former [2005/09] | 01 /
Klyachko, Elena Vitalievna ul. Ostozhenka, 1/9 Apt.3 119034 Moscow / RU | ||
02 /
Shakulov, Rustem Saidovich Leninskiy prospect, 91 Apt.223 117313 Moscow / RU | |||
03 /
Kozlov, Yuri Ivanovich ul. Golubinskaya, 7 bldg. 2 Apt.178 117574 Moscow / RU | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2014/30] |
Former [2005/09] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04020392.9 | 27.08.2004 | [2005/09] | Priority number, date | RU20030126290 | 29.08.2003 Original published format: RU 2003126290 | [2005/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1510570 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1510570 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | [2006/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1510570 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, C12P13/24 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
C12P13/24 (EP,US);
C12N1/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/52] |
Former [2005/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von L-Histidin durch die Verwendung von Bakterien aus der Familie Enterobacteriaceae | [2013/52] | English: | Method for producing L-histidine using bacteria of enterobacteriaceae family | [2005/09] | French: | Procédé de production de L-histidine utilisant des bactéries de la famille Enterobacteriaceae | [2005/09] |
Former [2005/09] | Verfahren zur Herstellung der L-Histidine durch die Verwendung von Bakterien aus der Familie Enterobacteriaceae | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 13.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 20.10.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.02.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2011 | Observations by third parties | 23.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 17.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 10.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.11.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - AIBA A ET AL, "NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCE ANALYSIS OF GENES PUR-H AND PUR-D INVOLVED IN THE DE NOVO PURINE NUCLEOTIDE BIOSYNTHESIS OF ESCHERICHIA-COLI", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1989), vol. 264, no. 35, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 21239 - 21246, XP002368277 [X] 1-11,14,15,18,22 * the whole document * | [X] - RAYL E A ET AL, "The human purH gene product, 5-aminoimidazole-4-carboxamide ribonucleotide formyltransferase/IMP cyclohydrolase", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM,, US, (19960126), vol. 271, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 2225 - 2233, XP002151229 [X] 1-11,14,15,18,22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.4.2225 | [X] - TIBBETTS ANNE S ET AL, "Characterization of two 5-aminoimidazole-4-carboxamide ribonucleotide transformylase/inosine monophosphate cyclohydrolase isozymes from Saccharomyces cerevisiae", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20000707), vol. 275, no. 27, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 20920 - 20927, XP002368279 [X] 1-18,20-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M909851199 | [A] - PETERSEN CARSTEN ET AL, "The cryptic adenine deaminase gene of Escherichia coli. Silencing by the nucleoid-associated DNA-binding protein, H-NS, and activation by insertion elements", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20020830), vol. 277, no. 35, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 31373 - 31380, XP002368278 [A] 1-18,20-22 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M204268200 |