EP1510298 - Power tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/09] | Reciprocating power tool | ||
[2010/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Makita Corporation 3-11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken 446-8502 / JP | [2010/50] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states MAKITA CORPORATION 3-11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken, 446-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oki, Sadaharu c/o Makita Corporation 3-11-8 Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi 446-8502 / JP | [2010/50] |
Former [2005/09] | 01 /
Oki, Sadaharu, c/o Makita Corporation 3-11-8 Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi 446-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04020454.7 | 27.08.2004 | [2005/09] | Priority number, date | JP20030308573 | 01.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003308573 | [2005/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1510298 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1510298 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B25D17/04 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
B23D51/01 (EP);
B25D17/043 (EP);
B25D2217/0092 (EP);
B25D2250/371 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/47] |
Former [2005/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kraftwerkzeug | [2010/32] | English: | Power tool | [2010/32] | French: | Outil électrique | [2010/32] |
Former [2005/09] | Hin- und herbewegendes Kraftwerkzeug | ||
Former [2005/09] | Reciprocating power tool | ||
Former [2005/09] | Outil électrique à mouvement alternatif | Examination procedure | 02.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 27.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2425245 (JOHNSON CONRAD B) [X] 1,2,7 * column 3, line 65 - line 69 ** figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE1672058U (WEHRMANN PAUL [DE]) [X] 1,6-8 * figure 4 *; | [X]DE1260399 (NOWOSIBIRSKIJ ELEKTROTECHNITSC) [X] 1,6,8 * column 1, line 2 * * figure . *; | [X]DE10036078 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-6,8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0033] , [0037] * * figure 2 *; | [X]US2003132016 (MEIXNER GERHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,6,8 * figures 1,2,4 * | Examination | US4282938 | GB2137132 | US5927407 |