EP1481808 - Ink cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyazawa, Hisashi c/o Seiko Epson Corp., 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 02 /
Shinada, Satoshi c/o Seiko Epson Corp., 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 03 /
Sakai, Yasuto c/o Seiko Epson Corp., 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04020548.6 | 19.10.2001 | [2004/49] | Priority number, date | JP20000321207 | 20.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000321207 | JP20000320319 | 20.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000320319 | JP20010033074 | 09.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001033074 | JP20010147418 | 17.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001147418 | JP20010149315 | 18.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001149315 | JP20010264896 | 31.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001264896 | JP20010104526 | 03.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001104526 | [2005/08] |
Former [2004/49] | JP20000321207 | 20.10.2000 | |
JP20000320319 | 20.10.2000 | ||
JP20010033074 | 09.02.2001 | ||
JP20010147418 | 17.05.2001 | ||
JP20010149315 | 18.05.2001 | ||
JP20010264896 | 31.08.2001 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1481808 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1481808 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
B41J2/17526 (EP,US);
B41J2/17509 (EP,US);
B41J2/17513 (EP,US);
B41J2/1752 (EP,US);
B41J2/1755 (EP,US);
B41J2/17553 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/49] | Title | German: | Tintenpatrone | [2004/49] | English: | Ink cartridge | [2004/49] | French: | Cartouche d'encre | [2004/49] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 28.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01124327.6 / EP1199179 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.12.2006 | CY | 13.12.2006 | DK | 13.12.2006 | FI | 13.12.2006 | TR | 13.12.2006 | GR | 14.03.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
CY | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
FI | 13.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4853708 (WALTERS MICHAEL A [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 26 - column 6, line 60; figure - *; | [A]EP0903236 (OWENS ILLINOIS CLOSURE INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0029]; figure 3 *; | [A]US5956057 (CHILDERS WINTHROP D [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 58 - column 6, line 45; figure - *; | [A]US6032010 (KIM JONG-WOO [KR], et al) [A] 1* column 3, line 3 - column 5, line 50; figure 9 * |