EP1529881 - Passage between a road and a sidewalk or a cycle path [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heinrich Klostermann GmbH & Co. KG Am Wasserturm 20 48635 Coesfeld / DE | [2005/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
König, Roland, Dipl.-Ing. Adolf-Häger-Strasse 22 34376 Immenhausen / DE | 02 /
Rüsing, Johannes Zum Odenheimer Bach 1 33165 Lichtenau / DE | [2005/19] | Representative(s) | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Franz-Mayer-Str. 16a 93053 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/13] | Graf Glück Kritzenberger Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a 93049 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2012/10] | Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Hermann-Köhl-Straße 2a 93049 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/49] | Graf, Helmut Patentanwälte Graf Wasmeier Glück Postfach 10 08 26 93008 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2005/19] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 04020576.7 | 31.08.2004 | [2005/19] | Priority number, date | DE20031052199 | 05.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10352199 | DE20041005165 | 02.02.2004 Original published format: DE102004005165 | [2005/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1529881 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1529881 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1529881 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E01C11/22 | [2005/19] | CPC: |
E01C11/222 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/19] | Title | German: | Übergangsstelle zwischen einer Fahrbahn und einem Gehweg oder Radweg | [2005/19] | English: | Passage between a road and a sidewalk or a cycle path | [2005/19] | French: | Passage entre une chaussée et un trottoir ou une piste cyclable | [2005/19] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 14.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.08.2004 | CY | 20.06.2012 | CZ | 20.06.2012 | DK | 20.06.2012 | EE | 20.06.2012 | FI | 20.06.2012 | IT | 20.06.2012 | PL | 20.06.2012 | RO | 20.06.2012 | SE | 20.06.2012 | SI | 20.06.2012 | SK | 20.06.2012 | TR | 20.06.2012 | AT | 31.08.2012 | CH | 31.08.2012 | FR | 31.08.2012 | IE | 31.08.2012 | LI | 31.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | BG | 20.09.2012 | GB | 20.09.2012 | GR | 21.09.2012 | ES | 01.10.2012 | PT | 22.10.2012 | DE | 01.03.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
TR | 20.06.2012 | ||
AT | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IE | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GB | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
DE | 01.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
AT | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IE | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GB | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
DE | 01.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IE | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GB | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
DE | 01.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
IE | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GB | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
DE | 01.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
IE | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GB | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
IE | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | EE | 20.06.2012 | |
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
SE | 20.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4715743 (SCHMANSKI DONALD W [US]) [Y] 14 * abstract * [A] 1; | [Y]DE29614809U (LEONHARDT & SOHN KG [DE]) [Y] 3 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [Y]DE29820015U (KARL WEBER BETONWERK GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 5,11,12 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2787128 (POINSIGNON PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [XY]WO0157341 (BUCK ROBERT V [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6-10 * the whole document * [Y] 3,5,11,12,14 |