EP1514888 - RTM and RI processable polymide resins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states I.S.T. (MA) Corporation 730 Worcester Street, (P.O.Box 51029) Indian Orchard MA 01151 / US | [2013/16] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states I.S.T. (MA) Corporation 730 Worcester Street, (P.O.Box 51029) Indian Orchard, MA 01151 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deets, Gary L. 745 Merrow Road, Nr 155 Coventry CT 06238 / US | 02 /
Xiong, Jianming 15B Pardun Road North Brunswick NJ 08902 / US | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/16] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/11] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04020786.2 | 01.09.2004 | [2005/11] | Priority number, date | US20030499849P | 02.09.2003 Original published format: US 499849 P | [2005/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1514888 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1514888 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/10 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
C08G73/101 (EP,US);
C08G73/10 (EP,US);
C08G73/1014 (EP,US);
C08G73/1064 (EP,US);
C08G73/1082 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31721 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/11] | Title | German: | RTM und Harzimprägnierung verarbeitbare Polymidharze | [2005/11] | English: | RTM and RI processable polymide resins | [2005/11] | French: | résines polyimides pouvant être utilisées pour des moulages par des résines de transfert et d'infusion de résine | [2005/11] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 27.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2008 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 14.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2008 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 03.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.04.2013 | CY | 17.04.2013 | DK | 17.04.2013 | EE | 17.04.2013 | FI | 17.04.2013 | MC | 17.04.2013 | SI | 17.04.2013 | SK | 17.04.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | GR | 18.07.2013 | [2014/20] |
Former [2014/11] | BE | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | BE | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | BE | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | BE | 17.04.2013 | |
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | BE | 17.04.2013 | |
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4389504 (ST CLAIR ANNE K, et al) [X] 1-3,5-22,24-30 * column 1, line 13 - line 18; claims 1-4 *; | [X]DE4232523 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-9,14-19 * claim 1 *; | [X]US6114494 (KIFER EDWARD W [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-9,14,16-19* claims 1,6,8,9,29-32,34,35 *; | [X]US6359107 (CONNELL JOHN W [US], et al) [X] 1,16,19,20 * claims 1,16,17; table 2 * | Examination | US6124035 | by applicant | US5965687 | US6124035 |