EP1486226 - Device and method of creating aerosolized mist of respiratory drug [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARADIGM CORPORATION 3929 Point Eden Way Hayward, CA 94545 / US | [2004/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lloyd, Lester J. 7 Haciendas Road Orinda, CA 94563 / US | 02 /
Lloyd, Peter M. 6239 Elderberry Drive Oakland, CA 94611 / US | 03 /
Rubsamen, Reid M. 102 El Camino Real Berkeley, CA 94705 / US | 04 /
Schuster, Jeffrey A. 5 El Portal Court Berkeley, CA 94708 / US | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04020817.5 | 27.10.1995 | [2004/51] | Priority number, date | US19940330929 | 28.10.1994 Original published format: US 330929 | [2004/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1486226 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1486226 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00, A61M11/00, B65D47/10 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
A61M15/0045 (EP);
A61M11/001 (EP);
A61M11/005 (EP);
A61M11/042 (EP);
A61M15/0051 (EP);
A61M15/008 (EP);
A61J7/0418 (EP);
A61M11/002 (EP);
A61M15/0085 (EP);
A61M16/1075 (EP);
A61M2016/0021 (EP);
A61M2016/0039 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2004/51] | A61M11/00, A61M15/00, B65D47/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/28] |
Former [2004/51] | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Herstellen von Aerosolnebel für atmungserleichternde Medizin | [2004/51] | English: | Device and method of creating aerosolized mist of respiratory drug | [2004/51] | French: | Appareil et procédé de création d'un brouillard d'aérosol d'un médicament respiratoire | [2004/51] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 09.05.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.09.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, ES, IT | 05.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/25] | 27.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/25] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95938938.8 / EP0788387 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.06.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.06.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.06.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0358002 (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4926852 (ZOLTAN BART J [US], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [A]US5172686 (ANTHONY JEAN-MICHEL [BE]) [A] * abstract *; | [A]WO9409842 (ROSEN CHARLES A [US]) [A] * figure -; claims 14-25 *; | [AP]WO9501137 (VOGES INNOVATION PTY LTD [AU], et al) [AP] * abstract *; | [LX]WO9609846 (ARADIGM CORP [US]) [LX] 1-7 * page 10, line 20 - line 35 * * page 15, line 13 - page 16, line 12 * * page 20, line 27 - line 32 * * page 43, lines 1-6 * * page 44, line 3 - line 23 * * page 48, line 10 * |