EP1512856 - A control apparatus for controlling the amount of intake air into an engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toyoshima, Hirokazu c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 1-4-1 Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Oie, Naoki c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 1-4-1 Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Nagashima, Masaaki c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 1-4-1 Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 04 /
Takagi, Yasuo c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 1-4-1 Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | [2005/10] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04020991.8 | 03.09.2004 | [2005/10] | Priority number, date | JP20030311292 | 03.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003311292 | [2005/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1512856 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1512856 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | [2007/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1512856 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/22, F02D41/14, F02D41/00, F01M13/02, F02D11/10 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
F02D41/2448 (EP,US);
F02D11/105 (EP,US);
F02D41/2451 (EP,US);
F02D2011/108 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0414 (EP,US);
F02D2200/501 (EP,US);
F02D2200/602 (EP,US);
F02D2200/703 (EP,US);
F02D31/003 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/10] | F02D11/10, F02D41/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2007/36] |
Former [2005/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Ansaugluftmenge einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2005/10] | English: | A control apparatus for controlling the amount of intake air into an engine | [2005/10] | French: | Dispositif de commande de la quantité d'air admise dans un moteur | [2005/10] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 11.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2148548 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * page 2, lines 16-38 * * page 7, lines 43-54 * * page 11, line 57 - page 12, line 5 ** page 12, lines 36-40 *; | [A]JPS60198349 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [A] 1,9 * abstract *; | [A]GB2162969 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 1, lines 23-32 * * page 2, lines 17-25 * * page 2, line 57 - page 3, line 58 * * figures 7a,7b *; | [A]US2001010214 (MAEGAWA YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [A] 1,9 * paragraphs [0039] - [0044] * * figures 1,2,4 *; | [PA]US2004139796 (BEYER HANS-ERNST [DE], et al) [PA] 1-16 * paragraphs [0025] - [0042] * * figures 1,2 * |