EP1527777 - Composition with antioxidant properties comprising an ester of ascorbic acid and a benzoyl rest [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mujica-Fernaud, Teresa, Dr. Gutenbergstrasse 41 64289 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Carola, Christophe, Dr. Bahnstrasse 80A 63225 Langen / DE | 03 /
Brunner, Marcus Karl-Marx-Strasse 5 64589 Stockstadt / DE | 04 /
Huber, Sylvia Blütenallee 4 64291 Darmstadt / DE | 05 /
Buchholz, Herwig, Dr. Dielmannstrasse 33 60599 Frankfurt / DE | [2005/18] | Application number, filing date | 04021292.0 | 08.09.2004 | [2005/18] | Priority number, date | DE2003151342 | 31.10.2003 Original published format: DE 10351342 | US20040574716P | 27.05.2004 Original published format: US 574716 P | [2005/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1527777 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/375, A61P17/16, A61P3/02, A61K7/48 | [2005/18] | CPC: |
A61K31/375 (EP,US);
A61K8/498 (EP,US);
A61K8/602 (EP,US);
A61K8/676 (EP,US);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61Q19/02 (EP,US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
A61K2800/522 (EP,US);
A61K2800/782 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/18] | Title | German: | Zubereitung mit antioxidanten Eigenschaften, die einen Benzoesäureester der Ascorbinsäure enthält | [2005/18] | English: | Composition with antioxidant properties comprising an ester of ascorbic acid and a benzoyl rest | [2005/18] | French: | Composition ayant des propriétés antioxydantes comprenant un ester de l'acide ascorbique et d'un résidu benzoyl | [2005/18] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 31.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/40] | 10.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10148970 ; | [X]JPS604127 ; | [A]JPS63279771 ; | [X]US2150140 (KURT WARNAT) [X] 1,4,7,8,10,11 * column 1, lines 17-21; claims 1-3 *; | [X]JPS604127 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [X] 1,4,7,8,10,11,18 * page 164, column 1; table 2 *; | [A]JPH10148970 (MINOLTA CO LTD) [A] 1,18 * compounds 11,27 *; | [X]WO0147564 (NYCOMED AMERSHAM PLC [GB], et al) [X] 19 * table 1; compound 11 *; | [A]EP1145710 (OREAL [FR]) [A] * paragraphs [0032] - [0042]; claims 1,6 *; | [X] - NOMURA H., SUGIMOTO K., "Synthesis of L-Ascorbic Acid Derivatives stabilized against Oxidation", CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (1966), vol. 14, no. 9, pages 1039 - 1044, XP009042908 [X] 18 * compounds III, IV, V, VI, IX * | [X] - IMAI, YOSHIO, "The antiscorbutic activity of some O-benzoyl derivatives of L-ascorbic acid in guinea pigs", CHEMICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN , 14(9), 1045-8 CODEN: CPBTAL; ISSN: 0009-2363, (1966), XP009043129 [X] 1,4,7,8,10,11,18 * page 1047, paragraph 1 - page 1048, paragraph 2; table II * | [X] - IMAI, YOSHIO ET AL, "Antiscorbutic activity of O-benzoyl derivatives of L-ascorbic acid in guinea pigs", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY , 17(2), 330-1 CODEN: JJPAAZ; ISSN: 0021-5198, (1967), XP009043128 [X] 1,4,7,8,10,11,18 * table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1254/jjp.17.330 | [XD] - GAN, LIXIAN ET AL, "Preparation and antioxidant activities of phenolic esters and ethers of L-ascorbic acid", JOURNAL OF CARBOHYDRATE CHEMISTRY , 17(3), 397-404 CODEN: JCACDM; ISSN: 0732-8303, (1998), XP009013604 [XD] 1,3,4,7,8,10,11,19 * page 399, line 1 - page 400, line 2; figure 1 * * page 397, line 1 - page 398, line 2 * | [X] - TANAKA H ET AL, "PHARMACEUTICAL STUDIES ON ASCORBIC ACID DERIVATIVES. I. SYNTHESES OF ESTERS OF ASCORBIC ACID AND THEIR PHYSICOCHEMICAL PROPERTIES", PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN. JOURNAL - YAKUGAKU ZASSHI, PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, TOKYO, JP, (1966), vol. 86, no. 5, ISSN 0031-6903, pages 376 - 383, XP002236531 [X] 18 * table I; compound XVI * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10148970 A 19980602 (MINOLTA CO LTD) [A] 1,18 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850516), vol. 009, no. 112, Database accession no. (C - 281), & JP60004127 A 19850110 (DAIKIN KOGYO KK) [X] 1,4,7,8,10,11,18 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890313), vol. 013, no. 105, Database accession no. (C - 575), & JP63279771 A 19881116 (NIPPON OIL & FATS CO LTD; others: 01) [A] * abstract * | [A] - BERGER S., OTTEN M.G., STEINBACH K., "Oxidation of Palmitoyl- and Benzylascorbate. - A 13C-NMR Study", LIEBIGS ANN. CHEM., D-WEINHEIM, (1992), pages 1045 - 1048, XP009043018 [A] 1,8,10,18,19 * compound 1B * | [A] - VESTLING C.S., REBSTOCK M. C., "2,3-diphenacyl and para-substituted diphenacyl ascorbic acid", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1945), vol. 161, pages 285 - 291, XP002315328 [A] * the whole document * |