EP1521514 - Parts feeder and component delivery apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YKK Corporation 1, Kandaizumi-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2017/50] |
Former [2005/14] | For all designated states YKK Corporation 1, Kandaizumi-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuda, Yasuhiko 717-16, Tabata Toyama-shi Toyama / JP | 02 /
Daijogo, Shinichi 587-1, Yoshida Kurobe-shi Toyama / JP | [2005/14] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/50] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/14] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7, II Aufgang 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04021467.8 | 09.09.2004 | [2005/14] | Priority number, date | JP20030343701 | 01.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003343701 | [2005/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1521514 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1521514 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1521514 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/02 | [2005/14] | CPC: |
H05K13/028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2017/18] |
Former [2005/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bauteilenzuführeinrichtung und Vorrichtung zum Abgeben von Komponenten. | [2005/14] | English: | Parts feeder and component delivery apparatus | [2005/14] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation en pièces et dispositif de distribution de composants . | [2005/14] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 25.02.2017 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2017 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 09.09.2018 | IT | 09.09.2018 | [2019/47] |
Former [2019/34] | IT | 09.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]JP2000136019 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [XD] 4-6 * the whole document *[A] 1-3,7,9,10 |