EP1635514 - Data processing device an ad-hoc network with presence information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aschauer, Rudolf Stuwerstr. 27/1/39 1020 Wien / AT | 02 /
Dorn, Christoph Alserstr. 32/21 1090 Wien / AT | 03 /
Ploninger, Christian Brünnerstr. 211/11/4 1210 Wien / AT | [2006/11] | Application number, filing date | 04021493.4 | 09.09.2004 | [2006/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1635514 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04L29/06 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
H04W8/22 (EP);
H04L67/54 (EP);
H04L69/329 (EP);
H04L51/58 (EP);
H04W8/24 (EP);
H04W84/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2006/47] |
Former [2006/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Datenverarbeitungsgerät und Ad-hoc-Netzwerk mit Presence-Information | [2006/11] | English: | Data processing device an ad-hoc network with presence information | [2006/11] | French: | Appareil de traitement de données et réseau ad-hoc avec information de présence | [2006/11] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/23] | 10.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.10.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.10.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003126213 (BETZLER BOAS [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X] - GREENE D ET AL, "Instant Messaging & Presence Management in Mobile Ad-Hoc Networks", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2ND IEEE ANNUAL CONFERENCE ON PERVASIVE COMPUTING AND COMMUNICATIONS WORKSHOPS, ORLANDO, FL, US, (20040314), pages 55 - 59, XP010688889 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PERCOMW.2004.1276905 | [A] - BANERJEE N ET AL, "Peer-to-Peer Instant Messaging and Presence Services over Wireless Ad Hoc Networks", IBM RESEARCH REPORT, (20040806), pages 1 - 7, URL: http://www.research.ibm.com/people/a/arup/rc23289.pdf, (20050207), XP002317986 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - UEDA T ET AL, "Implementing Messaging Services on Ad Hoc Community Networks using Proxy Nodes", 2ND SWEDISH WORKSHOP ON WIRELESS AD-HOC NETWORKS, ADHOC 02, STOCKHOLM, SE, (20020305), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://www.iimcal.ac.in/research/adhocnet/Papers/15.pdf, (20050207), XP002317987 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - DAY M ET AL, "A model for Presence and Instant Messaging", REQUEST FOR COMMENTS 2778, (200002), XP002199726 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - YANG B ET AL INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "Designing a super-peer network", PROCEEDINGS 19TH. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DATA ENGINEERING. (ICDE'2003). BANGALORE, INDIA, MARCH 5 - 8, 2003, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DATA ENGINEERING. (ICDE), NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030305), vol. CONF. 19, ISBN 0-7803-7665-X, pages 49 - 60, XP010678728 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDE.2003.1260781 | [A] - BORG J, "A Comparative Study of Ad Hoc & Peer to Peer Networks", MASTER'S DISSERTATION, LONDON, UK, (200308), pages 1 - 154, URL: http://www.ee.ucl.ac.uk/~lsacks/tcomsmsc/projects/pastproj/j_borg.pdf, (20050216), XP002317988 [A] 1-15 * page 1 - page 33 * * page 89 - page 100 * |