EP1518697 - Tape printing apparatus, tape printing apparatus charger and tape printing apparatus charging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | ||
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Toshihiro Tech. Planning & IP Dept. Brother Kogyo K.K. 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8562 / JP | [2005/13] | Representative(s) | Hofer, Dorothea, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | Hofer, Dorothea, Dipl.-Phys., et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25 d 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04021548.5 | 10.09.2004 | [2005/13] | Priority number, date | JP20030330850 | 24.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003330850 | [2005/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1518697 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1518697 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/407, H02J7/00 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
B41J3/4075 (EP,US);
H02J7/0044 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/13] | Title | German: | Streifendruckgerät, Streifendruckgerätlader und Streifendruckgerätladesystem | [2005/13] | English: | Tape printing apparatus, tape printing apparatus charger and tape printing apparatus charging system | [2005/13] | French: | Dispositif d'impression de ruban, chargeur de dispositif d'impression de ruban et système pour charger un dispositif d'impression de ruban | [2005/13] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 18.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.04.2010 | CZ | 14.04.2010 | DK | 14.04.2010 | EE | 14.04.2010 | FI | 14.04.2010 | IT | 14.04.2010 | NL | 14.04.2010 | PL | 14.04.2010 | RO | 14.04.2010 | SE | 14.04.2010 | SI | 14.04.2010 | SK | 14.04.2010 | TR | 14.04.2010 | CY | 21.04.2010 | BG | 14.07.2010 | GR | 15.07.2010 | ES | 25.07.2010 | PT | 16.08.2010 | IE | 10.09.2010 | LU | 10.09.2010 | CH | 30.09.2010 | LI | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | HU | 15.10.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BG | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
TR | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
IE | 10.09.2010 | ||
LU | 10.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BG | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
IE | 10.09.2010 | ||
LU | 10.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BG | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
IE | 10.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BG | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
IE | 10.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
IE | 10.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
FI | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SE | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 14.04.2010 | |
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 14.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP7296859 ; | [X]US2002186293 (ANDO MASAHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,4,9,18 * paragraph [0031]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0041]; figure 5 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 1996, no. 03, & JP7296859 A 19951110 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,4,9,18 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS6460232 |