EP1484585 - Coriolis flowmeter with digital control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Invensys Systems, Inc. 33 Commercial Street Foxboro, MA 02035 / US | [2004/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henry, Manus P 65 Crotch Crescent Marston Oxford OX3 0JL / GB | 02 /
Vignos, James H 129 Manning Street Needham Heights Massachusetts 02194 / US | 03 /
Clarke, David W 98 Old Road Headlington Oxford OX3 8SX / GB | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Butler, Michael John, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | Butler, Michael John, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2010/22] | Piésold, Alexander James, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2004/50] | Power, Philippa Louise Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04021672.3 | 26.11.1998 | [2004/50] | Priority number, date | US19970066554P | 26.11.1997 Original published format: US 66554 P | US19980111739 | 08.07.1998 Original published format: US 111739 | [2004/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1484585 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1484585 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1484585 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/84, G01F1/74 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
G01F1/74 (EP);
G01F1/8404 (EP);
G01F1/8431 (EP);
G01F1/8436 (EP);
G01F1/8486 (EP);
G01F1/849 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/50] | G01F1/84 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/16] |
Former [2004/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Coriolisdurchflussmesser mit digitalem Regelsystem | [2004/50] | English: | Coriolis flowmeter with digital control system | [2004/50] | French: | Débitmètre à effet Coriolis avec système de contrôle numérique | [2004/50] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 08.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.03.2010 | 23.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98309694.2 / EP0919793 | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 15.09.2004 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4823614 (DAHLIN ERIK B [US]) [A] 3 * column 12, line 50 - column 13, line 3; figure 1 *; | [A]US4852409 (HERZL PETER J [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4934196 (ROMANO PAUL [US]) [A] 1,2,102,103 * column 24, line 32 - column 25, line 7 * * column 25, line 22 - column 26, line 41; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US5469748 (KALOTAY PAUL Z [US]) [A] 1-3,102-104* column 7, line 51 - line 67; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0696726 (FOXBORO CO [US]) [A] 1-3,102-104 * column 8, line 53 - column 10, line 15; figure 12 *; | [PA]WO9820306 (SCHLUMBERGER IND INC [US], et al) [PA] 1,2,102,103 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4934196 |