EP1522793 - Smoke extracting hood [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bulthaup GmbH & Co. KG Werkstrasse 6 84155 Bodenkirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/15] | For all designated states bulthaup GmbH & Co KG Werkstrasse 6 84155 Bodenkirchen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Delbeck, Klaus Westendstrasse 42 80339 München / DE | 02 /
Heizinger, Robert Lena-Christ-Strasse 8 84494 Neumarkt-St. Veit / DE | 03 /
Reiter, Johann Hainzing 8 84155 Bodenkirchen / DE | 04 /
Hopf, Andreas Eichelgartenstrasse 4 74586 Frankenhardt / DE | [2005/15] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/42] | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/15] | Herrmann, Uwe, Dr-Ing., et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04021954.5 | 15.09.2004 | [2005/15] | Priority number, date | DE2003146716 | 08.10.2003 Original published format: DE 10346716 | [2005/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1522793 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/20 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
F24C15/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [2006/01] |
Former [2005/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dunstabzugshaube | [2005/15] | English: | Smoke extracting hood | [2005/15] | French: | Hotte d'aspiration de fumée | [2005/15] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 20.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/38] | 03.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3425334 (BROWN RICHARD E, et al) [A] 1,2* column 3, line 34 - line 55; figure - *; | [X]DE8805325U (BUERCHER-SIEGRIST, ROSMARIE, 8029 SAUERLACH, DE) [X] 1-3,5-7 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP1134501 (BUERCHER FRIEDRICH [DE]) [X] 1-7,15,16,13,14 * column 5, line 33 - line 55; figure 3 * * column 9, line 3238; figure 21 * | Examination | GB2185566 | by applicant | US3425334 | DE8805325U | DE19606708 | EP1134501 |