EP1516700 - Method of dressing polishing pad and polishing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu 570-8677 / JP | For all designated states ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu 570-8677 / JP | ||
For all designated states Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujishima, Tatsuya 986-5-H2 210 Yoshida Oizumi-machi, Ora-gun / JP | 02 /
Sameshima, Katsumi 21 Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | [2005/12] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04022232.5 | 17.09.2004 | [2005/12] | Priority number, date | JP20030324898 | 17.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003324898 | [2005/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1516700 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1516700 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B24B37/04, B24B53/007, B24B49/12 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
B24B53/017 (EP,US);
B24B49/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/05] |
Former [2005/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Abrichten von Polierkissen und Poliervorrichtung | [2005/12] | English: | Method of dressing polishing pad and polishing apparatus | [2005/12] | French: | Procédé de dressage de tampon de polissage et dispositif de polissage | [2005/12] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/32] | 20.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.12.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.12.2005 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003151934 ; | [X]EP0829327 (SPEEDFAM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7 * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 17; figure - *; | [A]US5951370 (CESNA JOSEPH V [US]) [A] 1,5,6 * abstract *; | [A]EP1063056 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1,5,6 * abstract *; | [A]US2001012749 (OGURI SHOZO [JP], et al) [A] 1,5,6 * abstract *; | [X]US2001015801 (HIROSE TAKENORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030903), vol. 2003, no. 09, & JP2003151934 A 20030523 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1,5,6 * abstract * |