EP1519005 - Cement-through, tubing-retrievable safety valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weatherford/Lamb, Inc. 515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 600 Houston Texas 77027 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC. 515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 600 Houston Texas 77027 / US | ||
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC. 515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 600 Houston Texas 77027 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagner, Nathaniel Heath 2202 Cypresstree Drive Spring, Texas 77373 / US | 02 /
Smith, Roddie R. 13627 Waverly Crest Court Cypress, Texas 77429 / US | 03 /
Duncan, George C. 15125 West Road, Apt. 627 Houston, Texas 77095 / US | [2005/13] | Representative(s) | Marchitelli, Mauro Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Marchitelli, Mauro c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2005/13] | Marchitelli, Mauro c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 04022396.8 | 21.09.2004 | [2005/13] | Priority number, date | US20030505515P | 24.09.2003 Original published format: US 505515 P | US20040853568 | 25.05.2004 Original published format: US 853568 | [2005/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1519005 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1519005 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E21B34/10 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
E21B34/101 (EP,US);
E21B34/10 (GB);
E21B34/102 (EP,US);
E21B43/12 (GB);
E21B2200/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB, IE [2005/51] |
Former [2005/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Produktionsrohrstrang herausnehmbares ventil zum zementieren | [2005/13] | English: | Cement-through, tubing-retrievable safety valve | [2005/13] | French: | Vanne de sécurité a recouvrable à un tube de production de puits pour cimentation | [2005/13] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 30.09.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.01.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.11.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4624315 (DICKSON RENNIE L [US], et al); | [A]US5145005 (DOLLISON WILLIAM W [US]); | [A]US5259457 (WILLIAMSON JR JIMMIE R [US]); | [Y]US6056055 (FALCONER GRAEME [GB], et al); | [A]US6296061 (LEISMER DWAYNE D [US]); | [A]WO03054347 (BAKER HUGHS INC [US]); | [PXPY]US2004154803 (ANDERSON ROBERT J [GB], et al) |