EP1528143 - Method for operating an apparatus for drying and dewrinkling garments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2005/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Damrath, Joachim Dr. Raiffeisenstrasse 7 89429 Bachhagel / DE | 02 /
Grunert, Klaus Donnersmarckallee 11a 13465 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Hafer, Christian, Dr. Taubensteinweg 8 85435 Erding / DE | 04 /
Spielmannleitner, Markus Rosenberger Strasse 49 73479 Ellwangen / DE | 05 /
Wetzl, Gerhard Hohweiherstrasse 15 89567 Sontheim / DE | [2005/18] | Application number, filing date | 04022551.8 | 22.09.2004 | [2005/18] | Priority number, date | DE2003150498 | 29.10.2003 Original published format: DE 10350498 | [2005/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1528143 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1528143 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D06F73/00 | [2005/18] | CPC: |
D06F73/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Trocknungs- und Glättvorrichtung für Kleidungsstücke | [2005/18] | English: | Method for operating an apparatus for drying and dewrinkling garments | [2005/18] | French: | Procédé de fonctionnement d'un appareil de séchage et de défroissage des vêtements | [2005/18] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 07.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/32] | 24.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE1585644 (CISSEL MFG COMPANY) [X] 1-5,7,12,18,32 * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 12, line L; figure - * [A] 6,11,14-17,23,33-40; | [XA]US3568900 (PARIS AUGUST F) [X] 1-7,12,32 * abstract * * column 4, lines 17-30 * * column 7, lines 32-44 * * column 11, lines 2-14,61-69; figures 1,6,12,14,14A,22 * [A] 23,33-35,39,40; | [XA]US3637128 (BLEVENS BERTRAM G, et al) [X] 1-5,7,12,14-18,32 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 22 * * column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 39 * * column 8, line 38 - column 12, line 57; figure - * [A] 6,8,14,23,33-40; | [A]DE19730358 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-6,12,23,32 * abstract * * column 3, lines 42-48; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9949123 (CAPECCHI CARLA [IT], et al) [A] 1-5,12,18,23,32-36,38-40 * abstract ** page 4, lines 25-31; figures 1-5 *; | [XA]EP0953669 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [X] 1-5,12,32 * column 5, paragraph 23 - column 6, paragraph 24 * * column 6, paragraph 26 - column 7, paragraph 30; figure - * [A] 6,7,13-22,33-40; | [XA]EP1039015 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1-10,12,32 * the whole document * [A] 23,33-36,38-40; | [AD]DE10063671 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [AD] 1,23-33 * column 2, paragraph 14 - column 5, paragraph 28; figure - *; | [XA]WO03057966 (FRUM HANAN [IL]) [X] 1-5,12,15,32 * page 12, lines 15-17 * * page 13, lines 3-13 * * page 24, line 6 - page 25, line 12; figures 1,2A,2B * [A] 6,7,11,16-18,23,33-40 |