EP1518586 - Protective headgear system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pabban Development, Inc. 17171 Daimler Irvine CA 92614-5508 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states Pabban Development Inc. 17171 Daimler Irvine CA 92614-5508 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Green, Lawrence 1113 Moore Avenue Santa Ana California 92707 / US | 02 /
Rios, Obed 2065 Maple Street Santa Ana California 92707 / US | 03 /
Murillo, Celestino 11532 Ninth Street Garden Grove California 92840 / US | [2005/13] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/13] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04022648.2 | 23.09.2004 | [2005/13] | Priority number, date | US20030667417 | 23.09.2003 Original published format: US 667417 | [2005/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1518586 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1518586 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | [2006/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1518586 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A62B18/04 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
A42B3/226 (EP,US);
A41D13/1153 (EP,US);
A42B3/10 (EP,US);
A62B18/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/13] | Title | German: | Schützende Kopfbedeckung | [2005/13] | English: | Protective headgear system | [2005/13] | French: | Système de protection de la tête | [2005/13] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 12.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 17.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.01.2010 | CY | 20.01.2010 | CZ | 20.01.2010 | DK | 20.01.2010 | EE | 20.01.2010 | IT | 20.01.2010 | NL | 20.01.2010 | PL | 20.01.2010 | RO | 20.01.2010 | SE | 20.01.2010 | SI | 20.01.2010 | SK | 20.01.2010 | TR | 20.01.2010 | BG | 20.04.2010 | ES | 01.05.2010 | GB | 23.09.2010 | IE | 23.09.2010 | LU | 23.09.2010 | CH | 30.09.2010 | FR | 30.09.2010 | LI | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
GB | 23.09.2010 | ||
IE | 23.09.2010 | ||
LU | 23.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
GB | 23.09.2010 | ||
IE | 23.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IE | 23.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 20.01.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6014971 (DANISCH SUSAN G [US], et al); | [A]GB2370972 (SMITH BRENT SPENCER [GB], et al); | [X]WO03000109 (SCOTT TECH INC [US], et al); | [A]US2003066121 (DIAZ LUIS A [US], et al); | [E]WO2004084664 (MED ENG SYSTEMS INC [CA], et al) | by applicant | US5054480 | US5711033 | USD460584S |