EP1591894 - Method and program for linking different applications through data displayed on screen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | For all designated states Fujitsu Frontech Limited 1776, Yanokuchi Inagi-shi Tokyo 206-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
For all designated states Fujitsu Frontech Limited 1776, Yanokuchi Inagi-shi Tokyo 206-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maeta, Takayuki Fujitsu Frontech Limited 1776, Yanokuchi Inagi-shi Tokyo 206-8555 / JP | 02 /
Katsumata, Yutaka Fujitsu Frontech Limited 1776, Yanokuchi Inagi-shi Tokyo 206-8555 / JP | 03 /
Eguchi, Shinichi Fujitsu Frontech Limited 1776, Yanokuchi Inagi-shi Tokyo 206-8555 / JP | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04022712.6 | 23.09.2004 | [2005/44] | Priority number, date | JP20040101435 | 30.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004101435 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1591894 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1591894 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
G06F9/54 (EP,KR,US);
G06F8/71 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/44 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/18] |
Former [2005/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Programm zur Verknüpfung von Anwendungen durch am Bildschirm dargestellte Daten | [2005/44] | English: | Method and program for linking different applications through data displayed on screen | [2005/44] | French: | Procédé et logiciel pour connecter des logiciels d'application à travers des données présentées sur un écran | [2005/44] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 23.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/39] | 11.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6253257 (DUNDON JACK P [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * column 4, lines 43-58 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 5 *; | [X]WO0239681 (IP BLUE LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * page 2, lines 15-21 * * page 3, lines 1-5 * * page 5, lines 3-5 * * page 6, lines 1-19 *; | [A]US6442752 (JENNINGS ANDREW T [US], et al) [A] 1-16* abstract * |