EP1522634 - Rear loading road milling machine with height adjustable sealing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wirtgen GmbH Reinhard-Wirtgen-Strasse 2 53578 Windhagen / DE | [2008/16] |
Former [2005/15] | For all designated states WIRTGEN GmbH Hohner Strasse 2 53578 Windhagen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ley, Herbert Am Ginsterhahn 25 53562 St. Katharinen / DE | 02 /
Gaertner, Olaf Buchenweg 2 53545 Linz/Rhein / DE | 03 /
Abresch, Stefan Raubacher Strasse 31 56269 Dierdorf / DE | 04 /
Simons, Dieter Am Sielspool 8 53567 Buchholz / DE | [2005/15] | Representative(s) | Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L. Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2005/15] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 04022744.9 | 24.09.2004 | [2005/15] | Priority number, date | DE2003147874 | 10.10.2003 Original published format: DE 10347874 | [2005/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1522634 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1522634 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | [2005/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1522634 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E01C23/088 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
E01C23/088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/15] | Title | German: | Hecklader-Strassenfrässmaschine mit höhenverstellbarer Abdichtungseinrichtung | [2005/15] | English: | Rear loading road milling machine with height adjustable sealing device | [2005/15] | French: | Dispositif de fraisage de route à chargement par l'arrière avec dispositif d'étanchéité réglable en hauteur | [2005/15] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 10.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.11.2009 | CZ | 11.11.2009 | DK | 11.11.2009 | EE | 11.11.2009 | FI | 11.11.2009 | IE | 11.11.2009 | NL | 11.11.2009 | PL | 11.11.2009 | RO | 11.11.2009 | SE | 11.11.2009 | SI | 11.11.2009 | SK | 11.11.2009 | TR | 11.11.2009 | BG | 11.02.2010 | GR | 12.02.2010 | ES | 22.02.2010 | PT | 11.03.2010 | HU | 12.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
NL | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
HU | 12.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
HU | 12.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 11.11.2009 | |
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 11.11.2009 | |
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 22.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4186968 (BARTON ROBERT M [US]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 22 - line 49; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5893677 (HAEHN GUENTER [DE], et al) [A] 1* column 7, line 7 - line 22; figures 1,3 *; | [DA]DE19739915 (SCHMAILZL JOHANN [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19739915 |