EP1494065 - Compact Camera [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210 Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Kiyotaka Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 3-13-45 Senzui Asaka-shi Saitama / JP | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Robert Patrick Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Jackson, Robert Patrick Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04022935.3 | 27.01.1999 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | JP19980015986 | 28.01.1998 Original published format: JP 1598698 | JP19980030166 | 12.02.1998 Original published format: JP 3016698 | JP19980030167 | 12.02.1998 Original published format: JP 3016798 | JP19980030241 | 12.02.1998 Original published format: JP 3024198 | JP19980030242 | 12.02.1998 Original published format: JP 3024298 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1494065 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1494065 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G03B9/08, G03B17/04 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
G03B17/04 (EP,US);
G03B17/02 (KR);
G03B15/05 (KR);
G03B17/08 (KR);
G03B3/10 (KR);
H04N23/50 (KR);
H04N23/56 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2005/01] | Title | German: | Kompaktkamera | [2005/01] | English: | Compact Camera | [2005/01] | French: | Appareil photographique compact | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/16] | 07.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.09.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 10.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99300600.6 / EP0933668 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.07.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.07.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB404683 (CHARLES JOHN STOKES, et al) [A] 1,2; | [A]GB684998 (REINHOLD HEIDECKE)[A] 1,2; | [A]GB2118314 (FUJI KOEKI CORP) [A] 1-4; | [A]US5608478 (KAMODA TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 1-4 |