EP1494066 - Compact Camera [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2006 [2006/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210 Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naka, Yoji, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 3-13-45 Senzui Asaka-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Yoshida, Yutaka Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 3-13-45 Senzui Asaka-shi Saitama / JP | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Robert Patrick Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Jackson, Robert Patrick Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04022936.1 | 27.01.1999 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | JP19980015986 | 28.01.1998 Original published format: JP 1598698 | JP19980030166 | 12.02.1998 Original published format: JP 3016698 | JP19980030167 | 12.02.1998 Original published format: JP 3016798 | JP19980030241 | 12.02.1998 Original published format: JP 3024198 | JP19980030242 | 12.02.1998 Original published format: JP 3024298 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1494066 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G03B17/04 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
G03B17/04 (EP,US);
G03B17/02 (KR);
G03B15/05 (KR);
G03B17/08 (KR);
G03B3/10 (KR);
H04N23/50 (KR);
H04N23/56 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2005/38] |
Former [2005/01] | DE, GB | Title | German: | Kompaktkamera | [2005/01] | English: | Compact Camera | [2005/01] | French: | Appareil photographique compact | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/16] | 09.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/16] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99300600.6 / EP0933668 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.08.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.08.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3864705 (WINKLER ALFRED) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4153355 (IKAWA KAZUO, et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US4522478 (KANDO TORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]EP0521351 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US5708884 (MORISHITA SHIGERU [JP]) [A] 1-13 * figure 1; claims 1,2 * |