EP1519459 - Spark plug [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Spark Plug Company Limited 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya Aichi / JP | [2010/49] |
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states NGK Spark Plug Company Limited 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya, Aichi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Tomoaki, c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya, Aichi / JP | [2005/13] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04022957.7 | 27.09.2004 | [2005/13] | Priority number, date | JP20030373435 | 27.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003373435 | [2005/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1519459 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1519459 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | [2009/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1519459 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01T13/39, H01T13/20 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
H01T13/20 (EP,US);
H01T13/39 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2010/26] |
Former [2005/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zündkerze | [2005/13] | English: | Spark plug | [2005/13] | French: | Bougie d'allumage | [2005/13] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 11.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002038992 (MORITA HITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [DA]JP2002184551 (NIPPON SOKEN, et al); | [DA]JP2002319469 (NIPPON SOKEN, et al) [DA] 1,2 * abstract * |