EP1524574 - Output regulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/16] | Voltage slicer | ||
[2010/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marvell World Trade Ltd. Parker House Wildey Business Park Wildey Road St. Michael / BB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | For all designated states Marvell World Trade Ltd. Parker House, Wildey Business Park, Wildey Road St. Michael / BB | ||
Former [2005/16] | For all designated states Marvell World Trade Ltd. Parker House, Wildey Business Park, Wildey Road St. Michael / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sutardja, Sehat 27330 Elena Road Los Altos Hills CA 94022 / US | 02 /
He, Runsheng 874 Pecan Court Sunnyvale CA 94087 / US | 03 /
Zhang, Jiancheng 14696 Manuella Road Los Altos Hills CA 94022 / US | [2005/16] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/16] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04023258.9 | 10.07.2003 | [2005/16] | Priority number, date | US20030460825 | 12.06.2003 Original published format: US 460825 | US20020395697P | 12.07.2002 Original published format: US 395697 P | US20020395115P | 10.07.2002 Original published format: US 395115 P | [2005/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1524574 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1524574 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1524574 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/575, H02M3/335 | [2005/16] | CPC: |
H02M3/157 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/08] |
Former [2005/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ausgangsregler | [2005/16] | English: | Output regulator | [2010/11] | French: | Régulateur de sortie | [2005/16] |
Former [2005/16] | Voltage slicer | Examination procedure | 29.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/16] | 05.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 04.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03763431.8 / EP1532501 | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002031001 (HARVEST NILS-OLE [DK]) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0017] - [0021]; figure 1 *; | [X]WO0231951 (PRIMARION INC [US]) [X] 1-8 * page 7, line 8 - page 14, line 9; figure 4 *; | [X]US6445169 (SCHULTZ AARON M [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 8 ** column 5, line 19 - column 5, line 65; figure 4 * | Examination | US5146155 |