EP1522475 - Vehicle-behavior detecting apparatus and vehicle-behavior controlling apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/11] |
Former [2005/15] | For all designated states FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takagi, Tomohiro c/o Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/42] |
Former [2005/15] | 01 /
Takagi, Tomohiro Fuji Jukogyo K. K. 7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/15] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04023715.8 | 05.10.2004 | [2005/15] | Priority number, date | JP20030350089 | 08.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003350089 | [2005/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1522475 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1522475 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | [2005/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1522475 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/00 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
B60T8/1755 (EP,US);
B60G2300/082 (EP,US);
B60G2400/0533 (EP,US);
B60G2800/016 (EP,US);
B60G2800/212 (EP,US);
B60G2800/246 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2006/35] |
Former [2005/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Erfassen des Fahrverhaltens eines Fahrzeugs und Vorrichtung zum Steuern des Fahrverhaltens eines Fahrzeugs | [2008/10] | English: | Vehicle-behavior detecting apparatus and vehicle-behavior controlling apparatus | [2005/15] | French: | Dispositif de détection et dispositif de contrôle de la dynamique de mouvement d'un véhicule automobile | [2005/15] |
Former [2005/15] | Vorrichtung zur Erfassung sowie zur Regelung des Fahrverhaltens eines Kraftfahrzeugs | Examination procedure | 02.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 02.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.10.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.07.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5417298 (SHIBAHATA YASUJI [JP]) [A] 1-3 * figure 14 * * claims 1-3 *; | [X]EP1162101 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0004] * * figures 2,3 * * claims 1-9 *; | [A]US6415215 (NISHIZAKI KATSUTOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1* column 15, line 33 - line 35 * |