EP1496197 - Shaft structure for a steam cooled gas turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/48] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oya, Takeaki, c/o Takasago Mach. Works Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Hirokawa, Kazuharu, c/o Takasago Mach. Works Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Tanioka, Tadateru, c/o Takasago Mach. Works Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Tanaka, Katsunori, c/o Takasago Mach. Works Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago Hyogo-ken / JP | 05 /
Uematsu, Kazuo, c/o Takasago Mach. Works Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago Hyogo-ken / JP | 06 /
Shinohara, Tanehiro, c/o Takasago Res. & Dvpt. Cen Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago Hyogo-ken / JP | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | Gehrsitz, Stefan, et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstrasse 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | Gehrsitz, Stefan, Dr., et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 60 86063 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04023741.4 | 25.08.2001 | [2005/02] | Priority number, date | JP20000292763 | 26.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000292763 | [2005/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1496197 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1496197 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/08, F01D25/16, F02C7/16, F01D25/12, F02C7/18 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
F01D5/085 (EP,US);
F01D25/125 (EP,US);
F01D5/08 (EP,US);
F05D2240/61 (EP,US);
F05D2260/205 (EP,US);
F05D2260/2322 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2005/02] | Title | German: | Wellenanordnung für eine dampfgekühlte Gasturbine | [2005/02] | English: | Shaft structure for a steam cooled gas turbine | [2005/02] | French: | Structure d'arbre pour une turbine à gaz refroidie par vapeur | [2005/02] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 23.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01120371.8 / EP1191188 | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 26.11.2008 | [2011/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0894942 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 24 - line 43 * * column 6, line 19 - column 7, line 38 * * column 8, line 16 - line 30 * * column 10, line 20 - line 55 * * abstract * [A] 3; | [XA]EP1010858 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 21 - line 33 * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 47 * * column 8, line 50 - column 9, line 9 * * column 9, line 49 - column 10, line 5 * * abstract *[A] 3; | [XA]EP1013895 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 50 * * column 5, line 33 - column 7, line 24 * * abstract * [A] 3 |